Castillo Frias v. Paulino Martinez

Plaintiff: Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias and Edgar Castillo
Defendant: Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez and Crisangel Paulino
Case Number: 1:2019cv02792
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edward R Korman
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019. Attorney Olga Batsedis appeared on behalf of petitioner. Attorneys Sharon Katz and Antonio Haynes appeared on behalf of respondent. The parties were directed to exchange initial disclosures, document requests and interrogatories by July 19, 2019; expert disclosures must be exchanged by July 29, 2019. Any briefing (limited to 3 pages) on the issue of whether petitioner's employment and/or bank records in the Dominican Republic must be produced must be filed by July 18, 2019; any response (limited to one page) must be filed by July 22, 2019. Respondent was directed to issue any subpoenas to known third parties for documents immediately. A status conference will be held on August 16, 2019 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo in Courtroom 11C South. The parties should be prepared to give an update on the progress of discovery and a timetable for moving forward. (FTR Log #2:27-2:57.) (Riquelme, Claudia)
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward R. Korman: Status Conference held on 7/11/2019. Pltff by: Olga Batsedis; Deft by Sharon Katz and Antonio Haynes. Status conf held on issue of visitation. Orders entered on the record. (Court Reporter ESR.) (Susi, PaulaMarie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 Letter Letter Brief by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias (Batsedis, Olga)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 Letter Responding to the Court's July 3, 2019 Order by Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez (Katz, Sharon)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on July 11, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least three days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a copy of which is attached here and a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/3/2019. (Prentice, Amanda) Modified on 7/3/2019 (Prentice, Amanda).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Status Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 8A South before Judge Edward R. Korman. The parties may file letter briefs not to exceed three pages by 7/9/2019. The parties are directed to contact the magistrate judge regarding any discovery requests. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 7/3/2019. (Arber, Jacob)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez. (Bivens, Frances)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER *** Defendant is directed to file a verified answer. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/26/2019. (Arber, Jacob)
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward R. Korman: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/25/2019.Case called. Attys Segal and Batsedis for Plaintiff, attys Katz and Haynes for deft. Argument heard. Ordered that an answer be filed in 7 days, that counsel hold the passports of the respective parties and the passports could only be released by order of the court, that the parties arrange for reasonable, supervised visitation, and discuss discovery the filing of an answer. (Court Reporter ESR Hong/Rocco) (Susi, PaulaMarie)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE re Hearing on #6 Order to Show Cause *** The hearing set for 6/24/2019 at 3:00 PM shall be held in Courtroom 13C. Please note the new location. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/24/2019. (Arber, Jacob)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Hearing on Petitioner's Order to Show Cause Scheduled for June 24, 2019 to be Converted to a Status Conference by Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez. (Haynes, Antonio)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Haynes on behalf of Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez (aty to be noticed) (Haynes, Antonio)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara Sheinfeld on behalf of Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez (aty to be noticed) (Sheinfeld, Dara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Katz on behalf of Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez (aty to be noticed) (Katz, Sharon)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances E. Bivens on behalf of Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez (aty to be noticed) (Bivens, Frances)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Affidavit of Service.Email to Respondent by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Email to Respondent) (Batsedis, Olga)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION AOS Certified Mailing upon Respondent with Mailing Receipt by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Certified Mailing Receipt) (Batsedis, Olga)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Personal Service upon Respondent by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias (Batsedis, Olga)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Olga Batsedis on behalf of Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias (aty to be noticed) (Batsedis, Olga)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not grant orders and judgment directing that the parties' minor child, M.C., be repatriated to the Dominican Republic. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8A South before Judge Edward R. Korman. So Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/21/2019. (c/emailed to counsel on 5/21/2019) (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias. (Herrera, Isaiah)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias against Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11471926 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit) (Segal, Philip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo Frias v. Paulino Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Rafael Castillo Frias
Represented By: Philip C. Segal
Represented By: Olga Batsedis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Castillo
Represented By: Philip C. Segal
Represented By: Olga Batsedis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisangel Radharani Paulino Martinez
Represented By: Sharon Katz
Represented By: Antonio Haynes
Represented By: Dara Sheinfeld
Represented By: Frances E. Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisangel Paulino
Represented By: Sharon Katz
Represented By: Antonio Haynes
Represented By: Dara Sheinfeld
Represented By: Frances E. Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?