Smith v. Zebra Technologies et al
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Motorola and Zebra Technologies
Case Number: 1:2019cv02823
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); that the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied as moot; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge V. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on May 23, 2019. (c/m with appeals packet) (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: the complaint, filed in forma pauperis, is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), and the plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this action.Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/22/2019. (Greene, Donna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Charmane Smith. (Williams, Erica)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charmane Smith. (Williams, Erica)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motorola, Zebra Technologies, filed by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Service of Process) (Williams, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Zebra Technologies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebra Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?