Fennell v. Experian

Plaintiff: Andre O. Fennell
Defendant: Experian
Case Number: 1:2019cv02862
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian. (Tobitsch, Kerianne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian. (Tobitsch, Kerianne)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 5/21/2019. (Marino, Janine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian. (Tobitsch, Kerianne)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Geller on behalf of Andre O. Fennell (notification declined or already on case) (Geller, Edward)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian from Civil Court, Queens County, case number CV-013515-19. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11478674) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Tobitsch, Kerianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennell v. Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre O. Fennell
Represented By: Edward B. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Represented By: Kerianne Tobitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?