1313 45 Realty LLC v. Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 1313 45 Realty LLC
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02891
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court held the initial conference in plaintiff's breach of contract case on July 12, 2019. The parties reported that they have begun to discuss settlement. The Court encourages the parties give settlement their best effort, especially in light of the ongoing business relationship between the parties.The Court shall hold a telephone conference on July 24, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange and initiate the conference call. After establishing contact with the defendant's counsel, plaintiff's counsel shall contact the Court at (718) 613-2170. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/12/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
July 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/12/2019 (FTR Log #12:12-12:25.) (Panjini, Madhura)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Aboulafia, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 1313 45 Realty LLC (Aboulafia, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's counsel removed this diversity insurance case from Kings County Supreme Court on May 15, 2019. ECF No. 1. Any party seeking a jury trial shall make a demand by June 24, 2019. Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3)(A).The Court shall hold the initial conference in this case on July 12, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by July 8, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/11/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Glanzberg on behalf of 1313 45 Realty LLC (aty to be noticed) (Glanzberg, Jack)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Aboulafia on behalf of 1313 45 Realty LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Aboulafia, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is hereby directed to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before Friday, June 7, 2019 at 5:00 P.M. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/21/2019. (Li, Natalie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Alfred Mottola on behalf of Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Mottola, Theodore)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Move or otherwise Respond by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Kalik, Lance)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Kalik, Lance)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company from Supreme Court of New York, County of Kings, case number 505593/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11483524) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1313 45 Realty LLC v. Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Represented By: Theodore Alfred Mottola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1313 45 Realty LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Aboulafia
Represented By: Jack Glanzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?