Cui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Jizi Cui, Shoumei Kan and Fengzhe Jin
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv02904
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shoumei Kan, Jizi Cui, Fengzhe Jin. Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office served on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Worontzoff, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jizi Cui, Shoumei Kan, Fengzhe Jin, Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11487952 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jizi Cui. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Worontzoff, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jizi Cui
Represented By: Daniel Walter Worontzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoumei Kan
Represented By: Daniel Walter Worontzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fengzhe Jin
Represented By: Daniel Walter Worontzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?