Gillespie v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Pamela Gillespie
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02907
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendants answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by August 14, 2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by October 14, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiffs motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by December 13, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by January 6, 2020. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/22/2019. (Greene, Donna)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/20/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11486697 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Pamela Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Gillespie
Represented By: Harold Skovronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?