Wong v. Cathay Pacific Airways Limited
Plaintiff: Siu-Ping Wong
Defendant: Cathay Pacific Airways Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv02977
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cathay Pacific Airways Limited. (Magali, Nicholas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cathay Pacific Airways Limited. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice (Other), by Siu-Ping Wong (Gaisi, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
May 22, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Siu-Ping Wong against Cathay Pacific Airways Limited filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11497429 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Siu-Ping Wong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gaisi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Cathay Pacific Airways Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathay Pacific Airways Limited
Represented By: Nicholas L. Magali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siu-Ping Wong
Represented By: Matthew Gaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?