North Shore Plaza Associates et al

Plaintiff: North Shore Plaza Associates L.P., Starrett Corporation, Joseph Maresca, Grenadier Realty Corp., North Shore Plaza Associates and Howland Hook Housing Co., Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02981
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REMANDING CASE. Defendants having conceded that the pleadings have failed to properly invoke this Court's subject matter jurisdiction, the case is REMANDED to the Supreme Court, Kings County, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/23/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lexington Insurance Company (DiUbaldo, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Jenna Schwartz on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Schwartz, Rachel)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 5/21/19 that Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within seven days of the date of this order why this case should not be remanded for a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/21/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wagner DiUbaldo on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (DiUbaldo, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Plaintiffs on 05/20/2019, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 505925/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11497887) (Attachments: #1 Removal Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Valenza-Frost, Nora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Shore Plaza Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Shore Plaza Associates L.P.
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starrett Corporation
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Maresca
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grenadier Realty Corp.
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Shore Plaza Associates
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howland Hook Housing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E. Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Wagner DiUbaldo
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Represented By: Rachel Jenna Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?