Nesbitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Venessa Nesbitt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02984
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Scott Appleton on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Appleton, Candace)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. If Defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then the Court should be notified in writing by that date. Such notification should include a request for an extension, which specifies a date and demonstrates the good cause for the extension, including the date the administrative record was requested, whether or not it has been received, and the most recent efforts made to obtain it. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendants answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by July 22, 2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by August 22, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by September 23, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by October 7, 2019. Memoranda in support of, or in opposition to, any motion filed in this matter, shall in all other respects comply with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Court's Individual Practices and Rules, including, but not limited to, page limitations. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/22/2019. (Brucella, Michelle)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11498030 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Venessa Nesbitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesbitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venessa Nesbitt
Represented By: Harold Skovronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?