Lubin v. Capella et al
Plaintiff: Murielle Lubin
Defendant: Heurys P Capella and Harmac Rebar & Steel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03016
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Murielle Lubin. Harmac Rebar & Steel Corporation served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Dell, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Murielle Lubin. Heurys P Capella served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Dell, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Femia on behalf of Heurys P Capella, Harmac Rebar & Steel Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Femia, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Heurys P Capella, Harmac Rebar & Steel Corporation. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11501743 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Murielle Lubin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Dell, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lubin v. Capella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heurys P Capella
Represented By: Richard John Femia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmac Rebar & Steel Corporation
Represented By: Richard John Femia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murielle Lubin
Represented By: Joseph G. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?