Foles v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sharon Foles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03021
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Sharon Foles. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service) (Pierre, Eddy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Scott Appleton on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Appleton, Candace)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 5/22/2019 Electronic Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting plaintiff's motion #2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/22/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Sharon Foles. (Pierre, Eddy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Elizabeth Sharon Foles against Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Elizabeth Sharon Foles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sharon Foles
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?