Martinez v. Pelletier et al

Plaintiff: Lupe Martinez
Defendant: Guillaume Pelletier and Les Locations Savoie, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03060
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
July 1, 2019 Status Report due by 1/3/2020. See Judge Kuo's Minute Order dated 6/28/19. (Riquelme, Claudia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 6/28/2019. Attorney Anthony J. Emanuel appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney Douglas Martin Connors appeared on behalf of defendants. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. At the parties' request, this case is referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation to be completed by December 31, 2019. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by January 3, 2020 regarding the result of mediation. (FTR Log #11:13-11:26.) (Riquelme, Claudia)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING FILING AT #6 : The parties are directed not to file discovery materials on the docket unless the materials are filed in connection with a request for court intervention. See Local Civil Rule 5.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/19/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Proposed Discovery Plan per agreement (Connors, Douglas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Lupe Martinez. (Bornstein, Kenneth)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Valauri on behalf of Les Locations Savoie, Inc., Guillaume Pelletier (aty to be noticed) (Valauri, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on June 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Les Locations Savoie, Inc., Guillaume Pelletier from Supreme Court Queens County, case number 705713/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11507009) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of Attachments to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-Verified Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-Notice of Request to Admit, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E-Combined Discovery Demands, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F-Response to Notice of Request to Admit, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G-Notice to Admit) (Connors, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Pelletier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillaume Pelletier
Represented By: Douglas Martin Connors
Represented By: Matthew David Valauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Locations Savoie, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Martin Connors
Represented By: Matthew David Valauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Martinez
Represented By: Anthony J. Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?