Ayiomamitis v. Classic Escapes Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Defendant: Classic Escapes Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03280
Filed: June 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties report that they have settled the case in principle. ECF No. 8. The Court commends the parties' efforts to resolve this case. The August 1, 2019 conference is hereby cancelled. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing the case by September 16, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/26/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Anthony Ayiomamitis (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant, with plaintiff's consent, requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's copyright complaint. ECF No. 7. The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 26, 2019.The Court shall hold the initial conference in this action on August 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by July 29, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/27/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Classic Escapes Inc.. (Brown, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Ayiomamitis. Classic Escapes Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Classic Escapes Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Classic Escapes Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11534972 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayiomamitis v. Classic Escapes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Escapes Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?