Baker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina F. Baker
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03348
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court directs Defendant to file the administrative record on or before October 15; 2019; the parties to file their respective motions on or before November 15, 2019; and the parties to file their respective replies on or before November 29, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/31/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File nunc pro tunc, the administrative record and respectfully requesting approval of the proposed amended briefing schedule by Andrew M. Saul. (Mailloux, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. If Defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then the Court should be notified in writing by that date. Such notification should include a request for an extension, which specifies a date and demonstrates the good cause for the extension, including the date the administrative record was requested, whether or not it has been received, and the most recent efforts made to obtain it. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by July 12, 2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by August 12, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by August 26, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by September 9, 2019. Memoranda in support of, or in opposition to, any motion filed in this matter, shall in all other respects comply with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Court's Individual Practices and Rules, including, but not limited to, page limitations. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/12/2019. (Brucella, Michelle)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/11/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11548221 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Christina F. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Binder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina F. Baker
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?