Rogers et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Bevon Benn and Shaheim Rogers
Defendant: John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5, Sergeant Avinash Patel, The City of New York, Police Officer Matthew Fagan and Police Officer Umar Khitab
Case Number: 1:2019cv03360
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, September 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than September 5, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/12/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply -- The motion is granted on consent as to the City only. The City must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 3, 2019. In light of the delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than July 5, 2019, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the incident at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than July 12, 2019, the plaintiff must execute any such release; and (c) no later than September 5, 2019, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in, or present at the scene of, the incident at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/27/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by The City of New York. (March, Debra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaheim Rogers, Bevon Benn. Matthew Fagan served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019; Umar Khitab served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019; Avinash Patel served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019; The City of New York served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Uzoh, Ugochukwu)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthew Fagan, Umar Khitab, Avinash Patel, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Fagan, John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5, Umar Khitab, Avinash Patel, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11550293 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Shaheim Rogers, Bevon Benn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Uzoh, Ugochukwu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Avinash Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Debra M. March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Matthew Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Umar Khitab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bevon Benn
Represented By: Ugochukwu Uzoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheim Rogers
Represented By: Ugochukwu Uzoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?