Diggs v. DeBlasio et al
Plaintiff: Andre Diggs
Defendant: Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Correctional Officer Cherry, Warden Matthews and Mayor Bill DeBlasio
Case Number: 1:2019cv03371
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Account Statement in regards to Andre Diggs from Mr. T. Scully, Director, Rikers Island Central Cashier. (Love, Alexis)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).Because the Second Circuit has made clear that district courts "should not dismiss without granting leave to amend at least once when a liberal reading of the complaint gives any indication that a valid claim might be stated," Cuoco v. Moritsugu, 222 F.3d 99, 112 (2d Cir. 2000), the Court grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff has a genuine basis to believe that Defendant Cherry violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights when strip-searching him, see Holland, 197 F. Supp. 3d at 542-43, then he should include facts in his amended complaint that would support this belief. Plaintiff is advised that the amended complaint will completely replace the complaint, must be captioned "Amended Complaint," and shall bear the same docket number as this Memorandum and Order. All further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days or until further Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the Court will enter judgment dismissing this action. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/18/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Authorization filed by Anthony Diggs dated June 17, 2019. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE only signed by plaintiff Andre Diggs on June 17, 2019. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Diggs. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Authorization filed by Andre Diggs dated June 17, 2019. (Love, Alexis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. Your IFP application does not contain enough information for the Court to consider your request. Please complete the enclosed IFP application. Please also complete the enclosed Prisoner Authorization form. (Williams, Erica)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynthia Brann, Cherry, City of New York, Bill DeBlasio, Matthews, filed by Andre Diggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/12/2019) (Williams, Erica).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. DeBlasio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Brann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill DeBlasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?