Stark v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Moshe Stark
Defendant: NYPD Detective Estevez and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv03411
Filed: June 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Niki Renee Bargueiras on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Bargueiras, Niki)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of New York answer due 9/10/2019. The parties are respectfully reminded that all non-dispositive pretrial civil matters are handled by the assigned magistrate judge, and motions are to be addressed accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/11/2019. (Several, Emily)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by City of New York. (Thadani, Kavin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kavin Suresh Thadani on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Thadani, Kavin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Stark. NYPD Detective Estevez served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Padilla, Alexis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Stark. City of New York served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Padilla, Alexis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of New York, NYPD Detective Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Estevez summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, NYPD Detective Estevez filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11557171 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Moshe Stark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Padilla, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Detective Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Kavin Suresh Thadani
Represented By: Niki Renee Bargueiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Stark
Represented By: Alexis G Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?