Williams v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: City of New York, Chedian Williams, Yara Bonifacio and New York City Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv03428
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on September 17, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants City of New York and New York City Department of Corrections, shall answer move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 9/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/16/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by City of New York, New York City Department of Corrections. (Branch, Cassandra) Modified type of ECF motion event on 7/16/2019 (Gillespie, Saudia).
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Natasha Branch on behalf of City of New York, New York City Department of Corrections (aty to be noticed) (Branch, Cassandra)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chedian Williams. City of New York served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; New York City Department of Corrections served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Phillips, William)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yara Bonifacio, City of New York, New York City Department of Corrections. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Chedian Williams (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Friedman, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yara Bonifacio, City of New York, New York City Department of Corrections filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11561434 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Chedian Williams. (Friedman, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chedian Williams
Represented By: Joshua Mathew Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yara Bonifacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York City Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?