Perdomo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Herma A. Perdomo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv03468
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Scott Appleton on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Appleton, Candace)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #1 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record or otherwise move against the complaint by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by September 11, 2019. Defendant shall serve Plaintiff with its motion for judgment on the pleadings by November 12, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with its response to Defendant's motion, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by January 13, 2020; and Defendant shall serve Plaintiff with its reply, if any, by February 3, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall, on June 13, 2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05233. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, #3 , to Herma A. Perdomo 334 Bergen St. Unit 4L Brooklyn, NY 11217. (vba) Modified on 6/5/2019 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/5/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by Herma A. Perdomo. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Herma A. Perdomo.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Herma A. Perdomo.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdomo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herma A. Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?