Lucas v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Lucas
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-10, Detective Daniel Sjoberg, Detective Thomas Reo, Lieutenant Robert Bracero, City of New York, Detective Adam Georg, Dep. Chief Inspector Kevin T. Catalina, Detective Jason Fritz, Detective Stephen Lalchan, Former Detective Kevin Desormeau and Captain Keith Shine
Case Number: 1:2019cv03494
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must respond to the Complaint by September 16, 2019. Counsel are directed to promptly arrange for the preparation, execution, and processing of the referenced releases. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/19/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by City of New York. (McLaren, Joanne)
July 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. City of New York served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Daniel Sjoberg served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Keith Shine served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Adam Georg served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Stephen Lalchan served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Jason Fritz served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Thomas Reo served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Lucas. Robert Bracero served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Harvis, Gabriel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Ramesar, Thameera)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Trevor Lucas (Fett, Baree)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert Bracero, Kevin T. Catalina, City of New York, Kevin Desormeau, Jason Fritz, Adam Georg, Stephen Lalchan, Thomas Reo, Daniel Sjoberg. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bracero, Kevin T. Catalina, City of New York, Kevin Desormeau, Jason Fritz, Adam Georg, John and Jane Doe 1-10, Stephen Lalchan, Thomas Reo, Daniel Sjoberg filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11571151 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Trevor Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons) (Fett, Baree)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Daniel Sjoberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Thomas Reo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Robert Bracero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Joanne M. McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Adam Georg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Chief Inspector Kevin T. Catalina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Jason Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Stephen Lalchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Detective Kevin Desormeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Keith Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Lucas
Represented By: Baree N Fett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?