Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Shaikh et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Sonny Shaikh and Cafe Istanbul Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03500
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Cafe Istanbul Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Sonny Shaikh served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cafe summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cafe Istanbul Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11572103 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Deft. Sonny Shaikh, #3 Proposed Summons as to Deft. Cafe Istanbul Inc.) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Shaikh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Shaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Istanbul Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?