Chow v. SentosaCare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Walter Chow
Defendant: Leah Friedman, deena landra, Does 1-25, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Esther Farkovitz, David Rubenstein, Rochel David, Shaindy Berko, Shorefront Operating, LLC d/b/a Seagate Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Joel Zupnick, Avi Philpson, SentosaCare, LLC, Berish Rubenstein, Bruscha Singer and Shorefront Operating, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03541
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ross on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ross, David)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion of David M. Ross for leave to appear pro hac vice #19 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, which is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/9/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11743902. by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ross, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Greg Blankinship on behalf of Walter Chow (aty to be noticed) (Blankinship, D.)
July 29, 2019 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #17 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint. The parties are directed to review J. Block's motion rules which require a pre-motion conference before any dispositive motions are served and filed. J. Block's motion rules are located on the Court's website. Motion should be filed once fully briefed. (Innelli, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's supplemental letter application #16 dated 7/26/19 is GRANTED and will be discussed at the pre-motion conference scheduled on September 5, 2019 @ 11:00AM. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/29/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Semlies, Lori)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Supplemental MOTION for pre motion conference by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Semlies, Lori)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to substitute #14 is granted. Attorney Lori Semlies is hereby substituted for Attorney Christina Marshall as counsel for Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/18/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION #13 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager 7/18/2019. (Marziliano, August)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Letter request to substitute handling attorney in CM/ECF (Semlies, Lori)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically mistake filing - both receipts attached by SentosaCare, LLC. (Marshall, Christina)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick, filed by Walter Chow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- CMS Nursing Home Profile, #2 Exhibit 2-NYS Health Profile_ Seagate Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, #3 Exhibit 3-Letters of Administration, #4 Exhibit 4- PHHPC Memo re Change in Ownership, #5 Exhibit 5-PHHPC Memo re Project 152177-E, #6 Exhibit 6- NYS eCON - Summary for Sale of Facility, #7 Exhibit 7- ProPublica Article, #8 Exhibit 8-Historical CMS Ratings) (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application #8 dated 6/21/19 is GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled on September 5, 2019 @ 11AM. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/10/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Walter Chow. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 A.M. on 8/30/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/30/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/25/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for pre motion conference by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C) (Marshall, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. The parties are directed to review J. Block's motion rules which require a pre-motion conference before any dispositive motions are served and filed. J. Block's motion rules are located on the Court's website (Innelli, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- S&C) (Marshall, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Marshall, Christina)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE: The parties are directed to review J. Block's motion rules which require a pre-motion conference before any dispositive motions are served and filed. J. Block's motion rules are located on the Court's website. (Innelli, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT C by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Joel Zupnick, Deena Landra, Esther Farkovitz, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shaindy Berko, Leah Friedman, Berish Rubenstein, Bruscha Singer, David Rubenstein, Walter Chow, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Does 1-25, SentosaCare, LLC, Avi Philpson, Rochel David. (Marshall, Christina)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Deena Landra, Avi Philpson, Berish Rubenstein, David Rubenstein, SentosaCare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Shorefront Realty, LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick (Marshall, Christina)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 523769/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BNYEDC-11578581) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marshall, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chow v. SentosaCare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Chow
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson
Represented By: D. Greg Blankinship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Friedman
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: deena landra
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Represented By: David Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorefront Realty, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Farkovitz
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rubenstein
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochel David
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaindy Berko
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorefront Operating, LLC d/b/a Seagate Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Zupnick
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Philpson
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SentosaCare, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berish Rubenstein
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruscha Singer
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorefront Operating, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marshall
Represented By: David Ross
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?