Kuperstock v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norman Kuperstock
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03551
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the stay at #8 , the initial conference is rescheduled for 10/29/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/29/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Letter filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.: Application granted. Parties are to report to the Court the results of their settlement efforts within 90 days of the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 7/11/2019. (Fernandez, Erica)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of Defendant's counsel, the 7/15/2019 Initial Conference is rescheduled to 8/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #5 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 8/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/11/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent and scheduled for July 15, 2019 by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Kramer, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Joint Premotion Request to File Joint Motion to Stay Case During Parties' Participation in Early Evaluation & Resolution Program by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Kramer, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/15/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/11/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/18/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kramer, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11580772) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EX A - summons and complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B - CT Corp service of process, #4 Exhibit Ex C - removal notice to be filed in State Court, #5 Certificate of Service) (Kramer, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuperstock v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Kuperstock
Represented By: Lawrence Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?