Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. v. Staten Island Asphalt, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Staten Island Asphalt, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03561
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on September 24, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. Staten Island Asphalt, Inc. waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (DiGiulio, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Staten Island Asphalt, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. (DiGiulio, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. (DiGiulio, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Staten Island Asphalt, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11581824 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue Letter) (DiGiulio, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. v. Staten Island Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staten Island Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lewis DiGiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?