Detweiler v. Internet Point, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Everett Detweiler
Defendant: Internet Point, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03599
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference in plaintiff's copyright action on September 26, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by September 18, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/14/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Internet Point, Inc. (Mercer, Justin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Internet Point, Inc.. (Mercer, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Everett Detweiler. Internet Point, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Parker, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Internet Point, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Scott Everett Detweiler (Parker, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Internet Point, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11590801 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Scott Everett Detweiler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detweiler v. Internet Point, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Everett Detweiler
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Point, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Ryann Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?