Adragna v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Doreen Adragna
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03657
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
2 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:19-cv-15082, filed 07/11/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order, Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 150), On October 4, 2016, the Panel transferred 10 civil action(s) to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. See 220 F.Supp.3d 1356 (J.P.M.L. 2016). Since that time, 1,149 additional action(s) have been transferred to the District of New Jersey. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned to Judge Wolfson. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OE RELATED ACTIONS originally filed before the THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTI DISTRICT LITIGATION. (Marziliano, August)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa)
June 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/24/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11601321 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Doreen Adragna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adragna v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Adragna
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?