United States of America v. Syquia et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gerilyn Bilis, Gloria T. Syquia, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance and New York City Department of Finance
Case Number: 1:2019cv03668
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gerilyn Bilis served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mayhew, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Mayhew, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Defendant New York City Department Of Finance's Involvement in the Case. Application granted #12 . SO Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/13/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #12 . The Court has endorsed the proposed Order, but Government counsel improperly designated this filing on ECF as a "Motion for Order to Show Cause" when in fact no one was requested to show cause for anything. The parties' stipulation could have just had a So Ordered line on the bottom and been designated on ECF as a "Stipulation and Order." Government counsel must comply with the ECF filing protocols of this Court or her filing privileges will be terminated. DO NOT REFILE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/13/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why New York City Department of Finance Should Be Excused From Participation In Case Until Funds Are Available To Be Disbursed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Mayhew, Sarah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Forzaglia on behalf of New York City Department of Finance (aty to be noticed) (Forzaglia, Anthony)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Gerilyn Bilis. (Layne, Monique)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #4 Summons Issued by United States of America (Mayhew, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Gloria T. Syquia waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Mayhew, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Status Conference adjourned to 9/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. If the Government wants to wait for waivers, that's fine, but the Court is unlikely to extend the time within which service must be made. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for August 6, 2019 by United States of America. (Mayhew, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. New York City Department of Finance served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Mayhew, Sarah)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 8/6/2019 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerilyn Bilis, New York City Department of Finance, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Gloria T. Syquia. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Gloria T. Syquia, #3 Proposed Summons Gerilyn Bilis, #4 Proposed Summons New York City Department of Finance, #5 Proposed Summons New York State Department of Taxation and Finance) (Mayhew, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Syquia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerilyn Bilis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria T. Syquia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Finance
Represented By: Anthony Forzaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah T. Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?