Tsirkas v. Macy's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Tsirkas
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03676
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 7/30/2019 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 3/1/2020. On or before 3/2/2020, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 4/1/2020, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 5/1/2020, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 11/13/2019 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon.On or before 11/6/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Counsel will stipulate to substitute Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. for Macy's Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/31/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/31/2019 in Courtroom 13A South. Jessica Kronrad appearing for Plaintiff. Robyn Leader appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:51-3:58; 4:05-4:10.) (Quinlan, Krista)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting consent #8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of the parties, the 7/18/2019 Initial Conference is rescheduled to 7/30/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/16/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Maria Tsirkas. (Kronrad, Jessica)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order (Initial Scheduling Order) by Maria Tsirkas (Kronrad, Jessica)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Parties failed to file the joint proposed scheduling order per this Court's #5 Order. The Parties are to file the proposed order by 7/16/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/15/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Maria Tsirkas (aty to be noticed) (Kronrad, Jessica)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/11/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/27/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macy's, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc. for Macy's, Inc.. (Leader, Robyn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Macy's, Inc. from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, case number 713128/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11603820) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Email of June 5, 2019, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leader, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsirkas v. Macy's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Tsirkas
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Kronrad
Represented By: Francesco Pomara, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?