BJB Limited v. iStar Jewelry LLC et al
Plaintiff: BJB Limited
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation, iStar Jewelry LLC, Kmart Corporation, Brian Roth, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Brands, L.L.C., Sears, Roebuck & Co., Kmart Operations LLC, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Gary McMullan, John Does 1-5 and Yelnats, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03748
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Sears Brands, L.L.C. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Sears Holdings Management Corporation served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Sears, Roebuck & Co. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Kmart Operations LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Kmart Corporation served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Kohl's Corporation waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria A. Savio on behalf of BJB Limited (aty to be noticed) (Savio, Maria)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Gary McMullan waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Brian Roth waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. Yelnats, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BJB Limited. iStar Jewelry LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Feinland, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kmart Corporation, Kmart Operations LLC, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Gary McMullan, Brian Roth, Sears Brands, L.L.C., Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears, Roebuck & Co., Yelnats, Inc., iStar Jewelry LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Hong, Loan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Misthal on behalf of BJB Limited (aty to be noticed) (Misthal, Marc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by BJB Limited (AO120 Patent/Trademark Form) (Feinland, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by BJB Limited (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons) (Feinland, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Kmart Corporation, Kmart Operations LLC, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Gary McMullan, Brian Roth, Sears Brands, L.L.C., Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears, Roebuck & Co., Yelnats, Inc., iStar Jewelry LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11615193 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by BJB Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Feinland, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BJB Limited v. iStar Jewelry LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iStar Jewelry LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Brands, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelnats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJB Limited
Represented By: Marc P. Misthal
Represented By: Robert Phillip Feinland
Represented By: Maria A. Savio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?