Immerso v. United States Department of Labor
Plaintiff: Sandra Immerso
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 1:2019cv03777
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendant's #11 Application to Adjourn Pre-Motion Conference and Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Reconsideration: Defendant's #11 Application is GRANTED. The parties are instructed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference.Plaintiff's #12 motion seeking reconsideration of the court's denial of Plaintiff's #10 first motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/19/2019. (Olds, Edward)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re Scheduling Order, (requiring a conference for the reasons the DOL presented) by Sandra Immerso. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Jordan, Jack)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference due to counsel's unavailability by United States Department of Labor. (Mahoney, Kathleen)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Reconsideration: The Motion is DENIED. The pre-motion conference shall be held at 10:00 am on Thursday, August 29, 2019 in Room 4D South. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/16/2019. (Olds, Edward)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration of Minute Order 8/8/2019 by Sandra Immerso. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Jordan, Jack)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Anne Mahoney on behalf of United States Department of Labor (aty to be noticed) (Mahoney, Kathleen)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendant's #6 Application for a Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. The parties are instructed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint is extended until fourteen days following the entry of the order deciding Defendant's anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/8/2019. (Davis, Eleanor)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Immerso. United States Department of Labor served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons returned executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Affidavit of Service U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Summons returned executed as to U.S. Attorney General, #4 Affidavit of Service Solicitor of Labor, #5 Exhibit Summons returned executed as to Federal Defendant) (Jordan, Jack)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Letter by DOL Requesting Conference and Extension filed by Sandra Immerso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 131 citations prohibiting inferences) (Jordan, Jack)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis requesting a pre-motion conference by United States Department of Labor (Mahoney, Kathleen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Sandra Immerso (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Jordan, Jack)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11619414 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Sandra Immerso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Huber's email, #2 Exhibit 2 DI's Letter 10/28/2015, #3 Exhibit 3 DI's BRB filing 1/16/2018, #4 Exhibit 4 Huber's Declaration 8/15/2017, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jordan, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immerso v. United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Immerso
Represented By: Jack Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?