Lane v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tonya Lanet Lane
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03842
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Greene on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Greene, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendants answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by October 21, 2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by December 20, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiffs motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by February 18, 2020; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by March 10, 2020. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/9/2019. (Greene, Donna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tonya Lanet Lane. (Pierre, Eddy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Tonya Lanet Lane against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Tonya Lanet Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Lanet Lane
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?