4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC v. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)

Plaintiff: 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Case Number: 1:2019cv03848
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Greene, Donna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC (Christou, Andreas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are to appear for a pre-motion conference on September 4, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4G North. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/16/2019. (Chen, Irisa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Letter in Opposition to Defendant's Request for a Pre-Motion Conference by 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC (Christou, Andreas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The plaintiff is to respond to the defendant's letter for a pre-motion conference #7 by July 16, 2019. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/9/2019. (Chen, Irisa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Letter by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) (Narva, Jacob)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Exhibit, #1 Notice of Removal by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) (Narva, Jacob)
July 3, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreas Euripides Christou on behalf of 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC (aty to be noticed) (Christou, Andreas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A & B by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). (Narva, Jacob)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) from Queens County, case number 708593/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11629662) (Narva, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC v. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Represented By: Jacob Narva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4721 Ditmars Blvd LLC
Represented By: Andreas Euripides Christou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?