Polatsek v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Moshe Polatsek
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03862
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Scott Appleton on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Appleton, Candace)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 7/10/2019 Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before 9/10/2019. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by 10/10/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross-motion, by 10/24/2019; and Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by 11/7/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 7/10/2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Moshe Polatsek. (Williams, Erica)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Moshe Polatsek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/3/2019) (Williams, Erica).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polatsek v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Polatsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?