Orellana v. Grando et al
Plaintiff: Kelvin Romero Orellana
Defendant: Richard Grando, Karen Grando and John Grando
Case Number: 1:2019cv03868
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY in Opposition re #6 Reply in Support Order to Show Cause filed by Kelvin Romero Orellana. (Young, Jesse)
July 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: plaintiff's response to defendants' July 24th submission (docket entry #6) is due by August 1, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/25/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY in Support re #5 Order to Show Cause, filed by John Grando, Karen Grando, Richard Grando. (Poling, Kristin)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: For the reasons stated in the attached, defendants are directed to show cause, via ECF, by July 24, 2019, why this action should not be remanded back to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/19/2019. (Cardenas, Alex)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Michael Young on behalf of Kelvin Romero Orellana (aty to be noticed) (Young, Jesse)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Grando, Karen Grando, Richard Grando from Supreme Court of New York, Queens County, case number 709710/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11633184) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Defendants' Answer) (Poling, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orellana v. Grando et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Grando
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Grando
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Grando
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Romero Orellana
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Bader
Represented By: Jesse Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?