Choi et al v. 37 Parsons Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi and My Capital Investment LLC
Defendant: Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC, Yan S Fok, Jay Lau, 37 Parsons Realty LLC, WRE Consultancy LLC, Antonio Wong, Ming Yi Chueng, ABC Entities 1-50, John & Jane Does 1-50 and Lau & Associates P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03875
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Minute Entry for joint Initial Status Conference and Premotion Conference held on 8/29/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for plaintiffs, counsel for defendants Jay Lau and Lau & Associates, and counsel for defendant 37 Parsons Realty LLC appeared via telephone. The Court set the following discovery schedule: the parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 9/19/2019; serve written discovery requests and interrogatories by 10/3/2019; produce their documents and respond to interrogatories by 11/4/2019; and complete depositions by 1/3/2020. Additionally, defendants shall file their motions to dismiss by 9/12/2019. Plaintiff shall file its combined opposition (up to 35 page memorandum) by 9/26/2019; reply by 10/2/2019. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Linda Danelczyk) (Clarke, Melonie)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #37 . The Court VACATES #23 Clerk's Entry of Default and GRANTS defendant 37 Parsons Realty LLC's request for an extension of time to file its answer until 9/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/28/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 37 Parsons Realty LLC. (Coryat, Ruben)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 Letter Response to Pre-Motion Letter by Lau Defendants by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Seiss, Kyle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Firm Address and Email Added Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Coryat, Ruben)
August 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben Jospeh Coryat on behalf of 37 Parsons Realty LLC (aty to be noticed) (Coryat, Ruben)
August 20, 2019 Filing 33 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Yan S Fok has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Yan S Fok is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Ming Yi Chueng has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Ming Yi Chueng is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Antonio Wong has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Antonio Wong is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to defendants' #29 letter by 8/26/2019. A Premotion Conference on the proposed motion to dismiss will be held in conjunction with the Initial Status Conference which is reset to 8/29/2019 at 10:30 am by telephone. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the call and the parties will jointly call Chambers at 718-613-2230. The submission of a case management plan and joint summary letter required for the initial conference is waived. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/19/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference seeking permission to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss the Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Jay Lau, Lau & Associates P.C.. (Green, Anthony)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Asher Truitt on behalf of Jay Lau, Lau & Associates P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Truitt, Alexander)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Certificate of Default by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Seiss, Kyle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 Request for Certificate of Default by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Seiss, Kyle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Certificate of Default by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Seiss, Kyle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Certificate of Default by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Seiss, Kyle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant 37 Parsons Realty LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant 37 Parsons Realty LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 . The Lau defendants' time to answer is extended to 8/23/2019, however, counsel should note that the Initial Status Conference scheduled for 8/22/2019 will proceed as scheduled and therefore reminds the parties to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #8 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/9/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, Unopposed by Plaintiffs, by Jay Lau, Lau & Associates P.C.. (Green, Anthony)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Green on behalf of Jay Lau, Lau & Associates P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Green, Anthony)
August 3, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Certificate of Default by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Seiss, Kyle)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Yan S Fok served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Ming Yi Chueng served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Jay Lau served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Antonio Wong served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Lau & Associates P.C. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. 37 Parsons Realty LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Seiss, Kyle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Jay Lau. (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Seiss, Kyle)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE - no Proposed Summons submitted for Defendant Jay Lau. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 37 Parsons Realty LLC, Ming Yi Chueng, Yan S Fok, Lau & Associates P.C., Antonio Wong, Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 8/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/9/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Seiss, Kyle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Seiss, Kyle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A-Q to COMPLAINT by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, My Capital Investment LLC, James Choi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q) (Seiss, Kyle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11633821 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC, 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC, James Choi, My Capital Investment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Seiss, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choi et al v. 37 Parsons Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wong Real Estate Consultancy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan S Fok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lau
Represented By: Alexander Asher Truitt
Represented By: Anthony D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 37 Parsons Realty LLC
Represented By: Ruben Joseph Coryat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRE Consultancy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Yi Chueng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Entities 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lau & Associates P.C.
Represented By: Alexander Asher Truitt
Represented By: Anthony D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 37 Parsons Capital Advisors LLC
Represented By: Kyle Allen Seiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 165 Gregory Road Associates LLC
Represented By: Kyle Allen Seiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Choi
Represented By: Kyle Allen Seiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Capital Investment LLC
Represented By: Kyle Allen Seiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?