Jacobs v. Saul
Plaintiff: lester Jacobs
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03896
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendants answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by October 3, 2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by December 2, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiffs motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by January 31, 2020; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by February 21, 2020. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for thisdistrict and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but notlimited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regardingproper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e.,25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). Theparties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to therecord. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/9/2019. (Greene, Donna)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel G. Balaban on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Balaban, Rachel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by lester Jacobs (Delott, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by lester Jacobs (Delott, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by lester Jacobs (Delott, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by lester Jacobs (Delott, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by lester Jacobs (Delott, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11636290 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by lester Jacobs. (Delott, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: lester Jacobs
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Delott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?