Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Ciancimino et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: AYM Physical Therapy, P.C., Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C., A.C. Medical, P.C., Judson Dario Just, Angelo Saint Claire Daley, D.C., Ayman Hassan Elkhouly, John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-5, Michelle Agyakwah, D.C., Albert J. Ciancimino, M.D. and Vital Chiropractic, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03933
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #29 is granted. The deadline for Defendants AYM Physical Therapy, Michelle Agyakwah, Angelo Saint Claire Daley, Ayman Hassan Elkhouly, Sound Spine Chiropractic, and Vital Chiropractic to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to 9/19/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/29/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER : In light of the Plaintiff's letter #29 the request for certificates of defaults documents no. #21 , #22 , #23 , #24 and #25 against defendants' Vital Chiropractic, PC; Michelle Agyakwah, D.C.; Sound Spine Chiropractic. P.C.; Ayman Hassan Elkhouly and AYM Physical Therapy, P.C. are hereby vacated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/29/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, Certain Defendants time to file an answer to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to an including September 19, 2019 by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Henesy, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Betancourt on behalf of Vital Chiropractic, P.C. (notification declined or already on case) (Betancourt, Melissa)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Betancourt on behalf of Vital Chiropractic, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Betancourt, Melissa)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Betancourt on behalf of Albert J. Ciancimino, MD (aty to be noticed) (Betancourt, Melissa)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #20 is granted. The deadline for Defendants A.C. Medical, P.C. and Albert J. Ciancimino, MD to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to 9/19/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/27/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default as to Ayman Hassan Elkhouly, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Manpower/Military Status) (Henesy, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default as to Michelle Agyakwah, D.C., #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Manpower/Military Status) (Henesy, Steven)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for Vital Chiropractic, P.C.) (Henesy, Steven)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C.) (Henesy, Steven)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for AYM Physical Therapy, P.C.) (Henesy, Steven)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by A.C. Medical, P.C., Albert J. Ciancimino, MD. (Conroy, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of A.C. Medical, P.C., Albert J. Ciancimino, MD (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of A.C. Medical, P.C., Albert J. Ciancimino, MD (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Judson Dario Just served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Ayman Hassan Elkhouly served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Angelo Saint Claire Daley, DC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 9/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 9/20/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/6/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. A.C. Medical, P.C. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Vital Chiropractic, P.C. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. AYM Physical Therapy, P.C. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Michelle Agyakwah, DC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Albert J. Ciancimino, MD served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Henesy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Henesy, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Garin Scollan on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Scollan, Garin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A.C. Medical, P.C., AYM Physical Therapy, P.C., Michelle Agyakwah, DC, Albert J. Ciancimino, MD, Angelo Saint Claire Daley, DC, Ayman Hassan Elkhouly, Judson Dario Just, Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C., Vital Chiropractic, P.C.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.C. Medical, P.C., AYM Physical Therapy, P.C., Michelle Agyakwah, DC, Albert J. Ciancimino, MD, Angelo Saint Claire Daley, DC, Ayman Hassan Elkhouly, John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-5, Judson Dario Just, Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C., Vital Chiropractic, P.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11641004 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - A.C. Medical, P.C. - Part 1 of 3, #4 Exhibit 1 - A.C. Medical, P.C. - Part 2 of 3, #5 Exhibit 1 - A.C. Medical, P.C. - Part 3 of 3, #6 Exhibit 2 - Vital Chiropractic, P.C., #7 Exhibit 3 - Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C., #8 Exhibit 4 - AYM Physical Therapy. P.C., #9 Exhibit 5 - AANEM Recommended Policies, #10 Exhibit 6 - DOI Opinion Letters, #11 Exhibit 7 - Chart of Prohibited Billing) (Sirignano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Ciancimino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AYM Physical Therapy, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Spine Chiropractic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Dario Just
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Saint Claire Daley, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayman Hassan Elkhouly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Agyakwah, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Ciancimino, M.D.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Melissa Betancourt
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Melissa Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Garin Scollan
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Garin Scollan
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Garin Scollan
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Garin Scollan
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?