Masi v. Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alessandro Masi
Defendant: Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03935
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc., to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/6/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.. (Monagle, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alessandro Masi. Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11641375 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masi v. Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joong-Ang Daily News California, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandro Masi
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?