Chen v. China Airlines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Shuyain Chen
Defendant: China Airlines, Ltd., John Doe and Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2019cv03957
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #6 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference previously scheduled for August 7, 2019 is adjourned to September 9, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/6/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Letter for Adjournment of Initial Conference by Shuyain Chen (Yoh, James) Modified to add motion on 8/6/2019 (Gillespie, Saudia).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on August 7, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by China Airlines, Ltd.. (Banino, Bartholomew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by China Airlines, Ltd. from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 710267/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11645828) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint) (Banino, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. China Airlines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuyain Chen
Represented By: James Scott Yoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Airlines, Ltd.
Represented By: Bartholomew Banino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?