Bank v. Alliance Security Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Bennett, Todd C. Bank and Scott Dolemba
Defendant: Versatile Marketing Solutions, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Monitronics International, Inc. and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc
Other: Catherine Smith and LaVincent Nealy
Case Number: 1:2019cv03970
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER Dismissing Parties: On 7/26/2019, the Northern District of West Virginia remanded Case No. 14-cv-4410 to the Eastern District of New York. When the case was transferred, two additional plaintiffs, Mr. Jason Bennett and Mr. Scott Dolemba, were listed on the docket. On 8/12/2019, Mr. Bank #677 notified the Court that he has never represented nor been in any relationship with Mr. Bennett and Mr. Dolemba. As Mr. Bennett and Mr. Dolemba were not parties to Case No. 14-cv-4410, the Clerk of Court shall terminate them from the docket. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/20/2019. C/mailed. (Parties: Jason Bennett and Scott Dolemba terminated.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 678 Letter dated 8/6/2019 from John R. Teare, Jr., Esq., enclosing the Suggestion of Bankruptcy on behalf of Alliance Security, Inc., filed in the above-captioned case while it was pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia as part of a multidistrict litigation matter. W/Enclosures. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) Modified.
August 12, 2019 Filing 677 Letter by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER: Attorney John R. Teare, Jr. was notified by the Clerk's Office that if he plans to continue representing defendant Alliance Security Inc., he must be admitted to practice before this Court. If Mr. Teare does not move for admission in this Court by 8/26/2019, Alliance Security Inc. shall immediately retain new counsel who is admitted to practice in this Court. Furthermore, plaintiffs Jason Bennett and Scott Dolemba proceed pro se in this action; however the Court does not have contact information for either of them. Mr. Bennett and Mr. Dolemba shall provide their mailing addresses and their telephone numbers to the Court by 8/26/2019. The Court shall hold a conference in this case on 9/17/2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. Plaintiff Todd C. Bank shall serve a copy of this order on Mr. Bennett, Mr. Dolemba, and defendant and file proof of service forthwith. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/5/2019. C/mailed. (Status Report due by 8/26/2019; The Court's Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 10, 2019 The case of Bank v. Alliance Security Inc. et al, has been transferred from Northern District of West Virginia to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19cv3970. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Filing 675 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Filing 674 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-00215. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Case Remanded to the Eastern District of New York re MDL 2493. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 673 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPML CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED (re: pldg. (13 in CAC/2:14-cv-08880, 16 in CAC/2:15-cv-02644, 6 in CAN/5:16-cv-00456, 5 in FLM/8:16-cv-01306, 12 in FLS/1:15-cv-22862, 6 in FLS/9:16-cv-81313, 484 in MDL No. 2493, 5 in MIE/2:17-cv-12471, 5 in MIW/1:16-cv-00019, 5 in NJ/1:16-cv-00130, 32 in NYE/1:14-cv-04410, 5 in OHN/1:15-cv-02572, 14 in PAW/2:15-cv-00185, 7 in TXS/3:14-cv-00153) ) - 13 action(s) - Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Suggestion of Remand) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2493, CAC/2:14-cv-08880, CAC/2:15-cv-02644, CAN/5:16-cv-00456, FLM/8:16-cv-01306, FLS/1:15-cv-22862, FLS/9:16-cv-81313, MIE/2:17-cv-12471, MIW/1:16-cv-00019, NJ/1:16-cv-00130, NYE/1:14-cv-04410, OHN/1:15-cv-02572, PAW/2:15-cv-00185, TXS/3:14-cv-00153 (Attachments: #1 Attachment NDWV Order and Suggestion of Remand)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 672 RETURN RECEIPT as to (667 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 541 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB, 610 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB, 525 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB, 504 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 470 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB, 499 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 572 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB, 757 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB, 542 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 504 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB, 540 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB, 1324 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 740 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB, 470 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB, 510 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB, 561 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB, 797 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB, 179 in 5:17-cv-00138-JPB, 839 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB, 508 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB, 578 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB, 398 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB, 717 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 471 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB, 750 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB, 191 in 5:17-cv-00157-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED re ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 7/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 671 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1315 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Clerk's Judgment and 1314 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Holly Rae Latimore on 6/28/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 670 RETURN RECEIPT as to (667 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 541 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB, 610 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB, 525 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB, 504 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 470 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB, 499 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 572 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB, 757 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB, 542 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 504 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB, 540 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB, 1324 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 740 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB, 470 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB, 510 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB, 561 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB, 797 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB, 179 in 5:17-cv-00138-JPB, 839 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB, 508 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB, 578 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB, 398 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB, 717 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 471 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB, 750 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB, 191 in 5:17-cv-00157-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED for Craig Cunningham on 7/1/2019 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB ALL et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 669 RETURN RECEIPT for Mark W. Dobronski as to (661 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 661 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 711 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 711 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 465 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB, 465 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB, 536 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 536 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 1314 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1314 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order, (466 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB, 1315 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 537 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 712 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 662 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB) Clerk's Judgment. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 5:16-cv-00133-JPB(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 668 NOTICE by Monitronics International, Inc. of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND. Upon receipt of an order to remand from the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL Panel) and any joint designation of the MDL 2493 record by counsel or a party, the Clerk of this court is directed to transmit the following to the transferor court: (1) a copy of the member case docket sheet; (2) the entire file for the member case; (3) the docket sheet for MDL 2493, 1:13-MD-2493; (4) all Pretrial Orders(PTO) entered in 1:13-MD-2493; and (5) any other filing from 1:13-MD-2493 which the parties jointly designate. It is ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the MDL Panels transmittal of the remand order to this court, the parties shall file a joint designation of any non-PTO filings from 1:13-md-2493. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) (Copy to Clerk of the JPML and counsel (via CM/ECF); pro se parties (via cm/rrr)) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 666 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1314 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order and 1315 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Clerk's Judgment. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 6/19/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 665 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 6/20/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 664 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1315 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Clerk's Judgment and 1314 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 663 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/17/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 662 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Monitronics International, Inc. against Darren R. Newhart, Jeffrey Wagy, Keith Finklea, Todd C. Bank Signed by Clerk of Court on 6/17/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 5:16-cv-00133-JPB(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT: Claims against Monitronics International, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice by operation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and the Final Approval Order entered 6/12/18 from each of the listed actions. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/17/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 5:16-cv-00133-JPB(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 660 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1270 and 1271 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 6/13/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 659 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1292 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 6/13/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 658 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1304 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 6/10/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) Modified on 6/17/2019 to add recipient (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 657 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1292 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order Setting Settlement Week Mediation. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Geneva Meloy on 6/11/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 656 Mail sent to Geneva Meloy 1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Returned as Undeliverable, unclaimed, unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 655 Proposed Partial Dismissal Order And Judgment by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00087-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB, 1:15-cv-00161-JPB, 5:16-cv-00133-JPB(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 654 RETURN RECEIPT for Bryan Anthony Reo as to (1292 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(cmd) Modified on 6/6/2019 to add name to docket text (cmd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 653 Mail sent to Myrdis Foster 1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Returned as Undeliverable, unclaimed, unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 652 COPY OF JPML ORDER DENYING REMAND re: ( 475 in MDL No. 2493, 23 in NYE/1:14-cv-04410), ( #480 in MDL No. 2493, 28 in NYE/1:14-cv-04410) Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 6/3/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2493, NYE/1:14-cv-04410 (TLL) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 651 Mail sent to Mark W. Dobronski 1270 1271 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Returned as Undeliverable, unclaimed, unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 650 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 5/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 649 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cummingham on 5/20/19 Per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 648 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 5/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 647 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1281 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 5/20/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) Modified on 5/22/2019 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 645 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. A Status Conference was held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Status Conference on 5/2/2019. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 644 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Status Report by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 643 Mail sent to ISI Alarms NC Inc. 1270 and 1271 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order Returned as Undeliverable, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 642 STATUS REPORT/RESPONSE by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/22/2019 to correct document title (kac). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 641 RETURN RECEIPT re Myrdis Foster as to (1270 and 1271 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/6/2019 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 640 RETURN RECEIPT re Michael Worsham as to (1270 and 1271 Orders in 1:13-md-02493-JPB). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 639 RETURN RECEIPT for Geneva Meloy as to (1270 and 1271 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/9/2019 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 638 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1270 and 1271 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 4/6/19 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) Modified docket text on 4/23/2019 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT 975 . Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/3/19. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 635 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1268 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) First MOTION to Transfer Case to court of origination filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NEF Preliminary Approval Motion, #2 Exhibit NEF Preliminary Approval Order, #3 Exhibit NEF Amended Preliminary Approval Order, #4 Exhibit NEF Final Approval Order, #5 Exhibit NEF Position Paper of Monitronics and Class Counsel, #6 Exhibit NEF Clerk's Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB, 1:14-cv-00215-JPB(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 634 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. A Status Hearing was held before District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/19/2019. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 633 Mail sent to Bryan Anthony Reo DE1258 Order in 1:13-md-02493-JPB ALL Returned as Undeliverable - Refused. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 632 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark W. Dobronski on 11/19/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 631 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Holly Rae Latimore on 11/15/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 630 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 11/5/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 629 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB, Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Myrdis Foster on 11/6/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 628 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Geneva Meloy on 11/6/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 627 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 11/5/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 626 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1258 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 11/5/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER granting (1257) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC, John R. Teare, Jr., Niall A. Paul and Christina S. Terek as attorneys of record. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 624 MOTION to Withdraw by Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, Alliance Security, Inc., Jasit Gotra, Jasjit S. Gotra, Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 623 Mail sent to Mark W. Dobronski 1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order Staying Case Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 622 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Case Stayed - set per JPB. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 621 Rule 42(b) MANDATE of USCA as to 1224 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Notice of Appeal filed by Geneva Meloy - This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) take effect today. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER of USCA as to 1224 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Notice of Appeal filed by Geneva Meloy. The court dismisses this appeal. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 619 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB ET AL) Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED by Myrdis Foster on 9/4/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert re 1177 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 618 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB) Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 8/29/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 617 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 8/29/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 616 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1246 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Staying Case,. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 8/30/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 615 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1246 in in 1:13-md-02493-JPB Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 8/29/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER: This Court orders this matter be STAYED pending appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 18-1770. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 613 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1:13md2493 1232 Order and 1233 Bill of Costs. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 8/2/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 3, 2018 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1223 Order 1233 Bill or Costs. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 7/30/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 8/3/2018 to add document number (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 612 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1232 Order 1233 Bill of Costs. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 7/30/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 8/3/2018 to add party name(jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 611 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1232 Order and 1233 Bill of Costs,,,,,. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/28/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 610 Costs Taxed in favor of UTC Fire and Securities America Corporation, Inc. in the amount of $5,809.64 per 1232 Order. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER RESOLVING COST ISSUE AS TO DEFENDANT UTF FIRE AND SECURITIES AMERICA CORPORATION, INC. granting (1230) Motion for Bill of Costs in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. The Court hereby ORDERS that the Clerk shall tax costs in the amount of $5,809.64 in favor of UTC Fire and Securities America Corporation, Inc. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) (Copy to pro se parties (via cm/rrr)) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kac). Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct title of order (kac). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 608 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number WVNW001946 re ( 1224 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ET AL. ) Notice of Appeal filed by Geneva Meloy. (kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 607 Joint MOTION for Bill of Costs resolving cost issues by agreement, by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 606 PLAINTIFF VINCENT LUCAS'S RESPONSE TO 1223 POSITIONS OF MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND CLASS COUNSEL AS TO THE CONTINUATION OF THIS MDL RE 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ET AL. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 605 USCA NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING: 1224 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Notice of Appeal filed by Geneva Meloy. Fourth Circuit USCA Case Number: 18-1770. Case Manager: Emily Borneisen 804-916-2704. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 604 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re 1224 Notice of Appeal in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. (kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 603 Mail sent to Mark W. Dobronski 1207 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 602 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 1224 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. (kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 601 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1214 Final Order and 1222 Judgment in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. by Class Member/Objector, Geneva Meloy (Pro Se). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kac) (to 4CCA) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred to the Magistrate Judge: 1140 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ET AL. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 600 Other Document POSITIONS OF MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC., AND CLASS COUNSEL AS TO THE CONTINUATION OF THIS MDL filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cases naming Monitronics as a defendant which remain in the MDL after the settlement, #2 Exhibit B - Remaining cases where Monitronics not named as a defendant, #3 Exhibit C - Cases which are at least in part covered by the settlement)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 599 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 7/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 598 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1212 and 1214 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. SERVICE ACCEPTED by M. Foster on 6/18/2018 and M Worsham on 6/16/2018. Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt - M Worsham) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 597 Proposed Order (Judgment in a Civil Action) re(116 in 5:17-cv-00157-JPB-JES) Order by Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 596 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1212 and 1214 Orders in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al. PER USPS WEBSITE SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/15/2018 re Craig Cunningham; 6/14/2018 re Holly Latimore, 6/15/2018 re Bryan Reo, and 6/14/2018 re Mark Dobronski. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt Holly Latimore, #2 Return Receipt Bryan Reo, #3 Return Receipt Mark Dobronski) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 595 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1207 Order in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.. SERVICE ACCEPTED re Bryan Reo on 6/15/2018 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 594 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1207 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES). SERVICE ACCEPTED re Holly Latimore on 6/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 593 RETURN RECEIPT as to ( 1202 Order in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES). SERVICE ACCEPTED re Mark Dobronski on 6/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 592 MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement Agreement by Diana Mey re (1212 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Stipulation and Order,, . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 591 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 590 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1207 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 6/7/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 589 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The settling parties have agreed to allocate $120,000 for fees and expenses to Objector and her counsel. Plaintiffs shall withdraw Section F of Plaintiffs' 1179 Memorandum in Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement Agreement. Objector shall withdraw her Motion for Sanctions 1192 . This resolves all disputes between Objector, her counsel and Plaintiffs and class counsel. The court vacates Order to Show Cause 1193 . Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/11/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 588 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Status Conference held on 6/11/2018. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 587 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1202 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Holly Rae Latimore on 6/6/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 586 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1207 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 6/6/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 585 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1207 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Myrdia Foster on 6/7/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1207 Motion to Continue Status Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 02:00. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 582 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1202 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 5/30/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 581 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1202 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Myrdis Foster and Bryan Anthony Reo on 5/29/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 580 RETURN RECEIPT for ISI Alarms NC Inc., as to ( 1202 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 1202 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/29/2018 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER: An in-person Status Conference is now set for 6/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 578 Mail sent to ISI Alarms NC Inc. 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order on Motion for Sanctions. Returned as Undeliverable./Attempted unknown/unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) (Main Document 1201 replaced on 5/14/2018) (jss). Modified on 5/14/2018 replaced with correct document and regenerated NEF (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 577 RESPONSE by Catherine Smith to (910 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 910 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES) Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to Report and Recommendation, #2 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Melito Appellees Brief)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Creekmore, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 576 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order on Motion for Sanctions. SERVICE ACCEPTED Holly Rae Latimore on 5/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 575 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order on Motion for Sanction. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 4/30/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 574 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order on Motion for Sanctions. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Myrdis Foster on 5/2/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 573 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/28/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 572 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order on Motion for Sanctions. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 4/28/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 571 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1193 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order on Motion for Sanctions,. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 4/27/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 VACATED PER 1212 ORDER entered on 6/11/18. ORDER denying 1193 Motion for Sanctions in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 5/1/2018 corrected link (jss). Modified on 6/11/2018 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 22, 2018 Filing 569 MOTION for Sanctions by Catherine Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment P&A's ISO Motion for Sanctions, #2 Affidavit Davis Decl ISO Motion for Sanctions)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Creekmore, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 568 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER for proceedings held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Bailey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(ck) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 567 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Benjamin Nutley on behalf of Catherine Smith Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Nutley, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 566 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Diana Mey for proceedings held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Bailey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(ck) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/5/2018, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(ck) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 564 Exhibit List of Final Settlement Conference held 4/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff B, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff C)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(soa) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 563 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Final Settlement Conference held on 4/5/2018. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(soa) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 562 MANDATE of USCA as to 946 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Mey. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 561 MEMORANDUM (Supplemental) by Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba(on behalf of plaintiff and a class), Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey re (1180 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Response,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Godiva Magistrate Report and Recommendations, #2 Exhibit B - Email string between Jon Marshall and John W. Davis, #3 Exhibit C - Godiva Final Approval Order and Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 560 Decl of John W. Davis Other Document filed by Catherine Smith. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Creekmore, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 559 NOTICE by Catherine Smith Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Creekmore, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 558 Mail sent to Mark W. Dobronski 1157 1158 1159 1160 1161 . Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 557 RESPONSE by Monitronics International, Inc. to (581 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 448 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 584 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 57 in 5:17-cv-00157-JPB-JES, 872 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 374 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 629 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 596 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 857 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 365 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 424 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 610 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 624 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 395 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 532 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 660 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 49 in 5:17-cv-00138-JPB-JES, 338 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 340 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 641 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 1154 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 424 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 268 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 398 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 369 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 409 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 378 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 700 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 618 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 374 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 480 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 410 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 340 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES) Objections,. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 556 WITHDRAWN (Section F) please see 1212 Stipulation and Order MEMORANDUM in Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement Agreement by Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba(on behalf of plaintiff and a class), Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) Modified on 6/12/2018 to add docket text. (cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 555 Memorandum in Support re (79 in 5:17-cv-00157-JPB-JES) MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba(on behalf of plaintiff and a class), Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 554 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) by Scott Dolemba, Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey, Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Settlement Approval Order, #2 Jonathan Marshall Declaration, #3 Carla Peak Declaration, #4 Diana Mey Declaration, #5 Philip Charvat Declaration, #6 Scott Dolemba Declaration, #7 Janet and Michael Hodgin Declaration, #8 Jason Bennett Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtland Wayne Creekmore on behalf of Catherine Smith Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Creekmore, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 552 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1143 1157 1158 1159 1160 1161 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to ISI Alarms NC Inc. on 3/15/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 3/19/2018 to add name and USPS website (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 551 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1157 1158 1159 1160 1161 SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/13/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 550 USCA JUDGMENT 946 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Judgment)(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 549 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION of USCA as to [ 946] in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Mey. USCA Decision: AFFIRMED (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 548 RETURN RECEIPT re Holly Rae Latimore as to 1157 and 1158 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/2/2018 per USPS Website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 547 Mail Returned addressed to ISI Alarms NC Inc.. 1157 1158 1159 1160 1161 Orders. (mailed returned event could not be used, documents to link would not pull up)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 546 RETURN RECEIPT 1159 1160 1161 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Holly Rae Latimore on 3/8/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 545 RETURN RECEIPT 1159 [ 1160] 1161 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Myrdis Foster on 3/6/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 544 RETURN RECEIPT re Craig Cunningham as to 1159, 1160, and 1161 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/5/2018 per USPS Website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 543 RETURN RECEIPT re Michael Worsham as to 1159, 1160, and 1161 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 542 RETURN RECEIPT re ISI Alarms NC Inc. as to 1159, 1160, and 1161 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 541 RETURN RECEIPT re ISI Alarms NC Inc. as to 1157 and 1158 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 540 RETURN RECEIPT 1157 Order and 1158 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 3/3/18 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 539 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1157 and 1158 ORDERS in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL - SERVICE ACCEPTED by Michael Worsham on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER: In light of a settlement having been reached in this matter, the Motions 975 and 1061 are moot. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL: The 820 is granted. Exhibits A and D attached to the instant motion are deemed filed under seal and do not need refiled. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER terminating docs 1073 and 1108 . Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER GRANTING 823 MOTION BY DEFENDANT MONITRONICS INTERNATION, INC., TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/28/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER GRANTING 797 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNREDACTED MOTION AND EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/28/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Salene Rae Mazur Kraemer on behalf of Catherine Smith Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Kraemer, Salene) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 532 OBJECTIONS OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEE REQUEST to by Catherine Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Catherine Smith in Support of Objection to Proposed Settlement and Attorneys' Fees Request, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Servivce)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Kraemer, Salene) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 18, 2018 Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Davis on behalf of Catherine Smith Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Davis, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 530 Mail sent to ISI Alarms, Inc. 1143 Order Returned as Undeliverable/unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 5, 2018 Filing 529 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1143 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael Worsham on 1/30/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 528 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1143 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 1/29/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 527 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1143 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/29/18 as to Craig Cunningham per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 526 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1143 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 1/27/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER: For reasons appearing to the Court, the March 29, 2018, Rule 23(e) Final Approval Hearing is CONTINUED to April 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 524 MEMORANDUM by Diana Mey re (1140 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 523 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 522 Mail sent to Michael Worsham DE 1122 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES and ALL Order Returned as Undeliverable-Unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 521 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 10/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 520 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1122 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Mark Dobronski on 10/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 519 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1122 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 10/2/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 518 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 10/2/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 517 RETURN RECEIPT as to ( 1122 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES). SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 10/2/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: Order granting 1121 Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Final Approval Hearing set for 3/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey.) Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/28/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 515 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct (1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 514 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 1091 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. Returned as Michael C. Worsham as Undeliverable/unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 513 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 9/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 512 DUPLICATE ENTRY OF 1118 RETURN RECEIPT as to (1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(njz) Modified on 9/25/2017 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 511 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1115 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 9/22/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER: For settlement purposes only, plaintiffs Jason Bennett, Philip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba, Michael and Janet Hodgin, and Diana Mey are appointed Class Representatives and the following are appointed Class Counsel. Final approval hearing is set for 5/17/18 at 10:00 in Wheeling. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/17. All proceedings in this case, except those actions set forth in the Settlement Agreement and this Order shall be stayed pending further order of this Court.Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 509 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1100 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 9/1/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 508 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Diana Mey re (616 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 313 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 384 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 399 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 604 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 593 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 556 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 635 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 349 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 385 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 423 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 349 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 585 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 571 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 372 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 353 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 599 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 559 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 847 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 22 in 5:17-cv-00138-JPB-JES, 1108 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 832 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 507 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 675 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 369 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 344 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 315 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 243 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 399 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 339 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 315 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 455 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 507 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 506 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1100 in 1:13-md-2493 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 8/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER OF STATUS CONFERENCE: The parties indicated that they will be in a position to file for consideration their preliminary approval of settlement and notice plan by August 31, 2017. In addition, plaintiffs liaison counsel, Jonathan Marshall, represented that he will reach out to the individual plaintiffs and report his findings to the Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/17/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 504 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. A Status Hearing was held before District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 503 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1091 in 1:13md2493 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 8/11/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 502 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1091 in 1:13-md2493 Order SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 8/10/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 501 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1087 in 1:13-md2493 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/7/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 8/14/2017 as to Bryan Anthony Reo (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 500 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 1083 in 1:13-md2493 Paperless Order on Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 499 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1087 in 1:13md2493 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 8/7/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' (1089) MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING re 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Cancel Evidentiary Hearing scheduled for August 9, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 8/8/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) (Copy to pro se parties via cm/rrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 497 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1087 1:13md2493 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael Worsham on 8/5/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 496 MOTION to Cancel Hearing by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER : For reasons appearing to the Court, the August 17, 2017 Hearing on Motion for Class Certification is now set as a Status Conference. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) (Copy to pro se parties via cm/rrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 494 NOTICE by Alliance Security, Inc. Suggestion of Bankruptcy Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 493 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1083 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL Text Only Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The 1082 Motion to Continue the Evidentiary Hearing is RESCHEDULED until August 9, 2017, at 1:30. The 1077 Order setting the hearing for July 12, 2017, at 10:00 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 7/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 491 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 490 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1077 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 6/22/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 489 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1077 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Reo on 6/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 21, 2017 Reset Evidentiary Hearing per 1077 Text Only Order as to 1059 Motion to Compel in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL: Evidentiary Hearing reset for 7/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Wheeling Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 487 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Rust Murray on behalf of Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Murray, Jennifer) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 488 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2017. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Alliance Security's Inc.'s 1076 Motion to Continue Hearing is GRANTED. The hearing is rescheduled for July 12, 2017 at 10:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/15/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 485 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Alliance Security Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 484 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Alliance Security, Inc.'s 1072 Motion to Continue Trial is DENIED without prejudice for failing to comply with LR Gen. P. 88.02. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/14/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 483 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Alliance Security Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Stay All Matters Pending Court's Consideration of Potential Settlement by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 481 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 1051 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES. Order. Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 480 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1062 Order in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, et al.. SERVICE ACCEPTED by M. Worsham on 6/5/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 479 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1062 1:13md2493 jpb-jes Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 6/5/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Notices of Depositions of JASON BENNETT; JANET HODGIN; MICHAEL HODGIN; and SCOTT DOLEMBA. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Produce Documents 1059 shall be held on Friday, June 16, 2017 at 10:00 am in the Magistrate Courtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, WV. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/1/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 476 MOTION to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports of Jeffrey A. Hansen and Anya Verkhovskaya by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Plaintiffs' 1058 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 474 MOTION to Compel (Redacted Version) Alliance Security, Inc. to Produce Documents by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration, #2 Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration - Exhibit 3, #3 Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration - Exhibit 6, #4 Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration - Exhibit 7, #5 Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration - Exhibit 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 472 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1051 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 5/19/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 471 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1051 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 5/20/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 470 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1045 and 1046 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 5/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 469 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1045 and 1046 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/15/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 468 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1045 and 1046 in 1:14md2493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 5/13/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting 1049 Motion by Defendant Monitronics Internation, Inc. to File Its Reply Memorandum in Support of its Summary Judgment Motion and Supporting Exhibits Under Seal in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/17/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 466 REPLY to Response to Motion re (286 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES) MOTION Summary Judgment (Placeholders) filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 6 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 76 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 8 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #4 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 9 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #5 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 10 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibit 116 to Reply Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 464 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Jasit Gotra Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ( 980 IN 1:13-md-2493) MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER GRANTING ( 976 in 1:13-md-2493) MOTION BY DEFENDANT MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO FILE ITS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEF AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 461 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Matthew Pitts Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 460 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 459 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Jasit Gotra Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 458 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1024 and 1026 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 5/9/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 9, 2017 Filing 457 NOTICE by Diana Mey Amended Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information and Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 9, 2017 Filing 456 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Supboena to Produce Documents, Information and Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 455 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 1012 in 1:13md-2493JPB-JES Order. Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. FED. R. CIV. P. 26 EXPERT DISCLOSURE. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 453 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Security Inc. for Defendant Alliance Security, Inc.'s Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2). Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 452 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1026 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 4/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 451 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1026 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael Worsham on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 450 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1024 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 4/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 449 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1024 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 448 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Amended Notice of Deposition of Anthony Bolognese Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 447 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Fourth Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) Modified on 4/24/2017, The attached document is the Notice PLUS Definitions and Instructions, NEF Regenerated) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 446 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Amended Notice of Deposition of Matthew Pitts Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 445 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Amended Notice of Deposition of Jasit Gotra Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting 1022 Motion to Seal in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/18/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 443 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1012 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 4/15/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting 1018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/17/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re (975 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendant Monitronics International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Marshall in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Monitronics International, Inc., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 12, 2017 Filing 439 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1012 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 4/8/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 4/17/2017 (jss) - added brackets to docket entry. [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Objections to Notices of Deposition. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Notices of Depositon of Diana Mey and Philip Charvat. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 436 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 435 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Matthew Pitts Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 434 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Jasit Gotra Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 433 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Anthony Bolognese Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 432 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE: ORDERED that the additional mediation set by Order dated March 27, 2017 1003 , be EXTENDED to commence on or before June 15, 2017, and that Monitronics insurers who attended the first mediation shall attend the resumption of the mediation. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/4/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 430 RETURN RECEIPT as to 985 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/29/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 4/17/2017 (jss) - added brackets to docket entry. [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 429 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1003 in 1:13-md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/29/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 4/17/2017 (jss) - added brackets to document entry. [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties advised that they have resolved 944 Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees. Therefore, the 944 motion is DENIED as moot. The hearing set for 4/11/2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 4/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 427 RETURN RECEIPT as to 997 and 1003 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 3/30/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 426 RETURN RECEIPT as to 997 and 1003 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 3/30/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 425 RETURN RECEIPT as to (997 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES, Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/31/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Filing 424 RETURN RECEIPT as to 995 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael Worsham on 3/25/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Filing 423 RETURN RECEIPT as to 992 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael Worsham on 3/25/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 422 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This Court will GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART the Motion. The Scheduling Order of July 26, 2016, is hereby AMENDED as follows: Mediation on or Before: May 15, 2017 Motions for Summary Judgment Responses: April 15, 2017 and Replies: May 15, 2017; Plaintiffs Expert Depositions: March 31, 2017; Motions for Class Certification: June 15, 2017; Response: July 15, 2017; Replies: July 31, 2017; Hearing on Class Certification August 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Expert Designations: May 1, 2017; Discovery Completion: June 1, 2017. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/27/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 421 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended 30(b)(1) Deposition of Muawia Bishr) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 420 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended 30(b) Deposition Notice of Stacy Steelman) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 419 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended 30(b)(1) Deposition of Chris Soda) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 418 RETURN RECEIPT as to 992 995 in 1:13-md2493-JPB-JES SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/25/17. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt for de 995) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 417 Mail sent to Michael E. Worsham [966} in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES. Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed as to Michael C. Worsham. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The moving party filed a 996 Notice withdrawing their 979 Motion to Compel. The moving party is not seeking costs. Therefore, the 979 Motion to Compel is DENIED as moot and the hearing set for 3/28/2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 3/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 415 NOTICE by Diana Mey re (979 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Defendant Monitronics to Provide Deposition Testimony Regarding Purportedly Privileged Matters Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 TEXT ONLY ORDER MODIFYING the Courts 985 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing and Argument. Only primary attorneys to this motion are required to appear. Local primary attorneys are required to appear in person and the San Diego and Seattle attorneys may appear by telephone. However, this modification only applies if the parties file a joint statement listing every issue in dispute by 5:00 pm on Monday March 27, 2017. In the event that there are future issues the hearings will be held in Wheeling at 9:00 am on Saturday mornings until all the issues are resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 3/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 413 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2017. (Tape #WHG Seibert 1 13 md 2493 Monitronics 3 23 2017.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 412 *SEALED* REPORT of MediatorAssociated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Order granting (747) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Vickie E. Turner and Robert K. Dixon. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/23/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 410 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct (985 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 985 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 263 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 263 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 268 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 268 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 725 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 725 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 479 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 479 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 212 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 212 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 281 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 281 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 140 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 140 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 512 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 512 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 532 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 532 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 352 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 352 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 500 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 500 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 250 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 250 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 282 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 282 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 235 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 235 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 571 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 571 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 210 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 210 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 296 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 296 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 320 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 320 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 212 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 212 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 456 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 456 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 468 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 468 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 496 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 496 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 742 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 742 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 241 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 241 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 490 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 490 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 296 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 296 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 404 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 404 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 452 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 452 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES) Order,,, Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and Social Security Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings,, by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (VICKIE E. TURNER AND ROBERT K. DIXON) by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 408 RESPONSE in Opposition re (494 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 206 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 446 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 462 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 526 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 314 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 346 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 450 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 484 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 979 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 204 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 134 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 473 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 565 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 490 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 240 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 276 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 235 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 398 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 262 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 290 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 290 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 736 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 206 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 244 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 275 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 506 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 719 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 257 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 229 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 240 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Defendant Monitronics to Provide Deposition Testimony Regarding Purportedly Privileged Matters filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce Mungiguerra)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 407 RETURN RECEIPT as to 985 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 406 RETURN RECEIPT as to 985 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 3/18/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 405 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Monitronics To Provide Deposition Testimony Regarding Purportedly Privileged Matters 979 shall be held Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., in the Magistrate Judge Courtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets,Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 3/15/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. For Second Amended Notice of Deposition of DOUGLAS E. FORREST. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 402 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Muawia Bishr Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 401 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Stacy Steelman Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 400 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Chris Soda Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 7, 2017 Filing 398 MOTION to Compel Defendant Monitronics to Provide Deposition Testimony Regarding Purportedly Privileged Matters by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 7, 2017 Filing 397 RETURN RECEIPT as to 970 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 3/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 7, 2017 Filing 396 RETURN RECEIPT as to 970 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 3/4/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 394 MOTION Summary Judgment by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Placeholder for Memorandum - Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #2 Attachment Placeholder for Exhibit 1 to Memorandum - Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #3 Attachment Placeholder for Exhibit 2 to Memorandum - Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #4 Attachment Placeholder for Exhibit 3 to Memorandum - Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #5 Attachment Placeholder for Exhibit 4 to Memorandum - Submitted For Filing Under Seal, #6 Attachment Placeholder for Exhibit 5 to Memorandum Submitted For Filing Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. For Amended Notices of Deposition of JEFFREY A. HANSEN, DOUGLAS E. FORREST, and ANYA VERKHOVSKAYA. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 392 RETURN RECEIPT as to 966 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES, Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 3/2/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 391 RETURN RECEIPT as to 970 in 3:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 3/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 390 RETURN RECEIPT as to (966in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Re on 3/1/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting (969) Motion in case 1:13md2493-JPB-JES. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 388 Consent MOTION Stay Allowance of Costs by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 28, 2017 Filing 387 NOTICE by Alliance Security, Inc. of Expert Witness Designation Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 28, 2017 Filing 386 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham (940 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES, Order. Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed/unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT: ORDER granting in part and denying in part 964 joint motion to continue as to 1:13md2493 JPB-JES. The hearing is continued until April 11, 2017, at 10 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 2/27/17. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 384 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert: Evidentiary Hearing re 944 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, et al. MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees held on 2/27/2017. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 383 Joint MOTION to Continue February 27, 2017 Hearing by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 382 RETURN RECEIPT as to (951 in 1:13-md-2493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 2/21/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 381 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham (920 in 1:13-md 02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed/unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 380 RETURN RECEIPT as to (951 in 1:13md2493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 2/18/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 379 RETURN RECEIPT as to 948 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 2/18/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 378 RETURN RECEIPT as to 948 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 2/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 377 RETURN RECEIPT as to 948 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on as to Craig Cunningham on 2/18/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 376 RETURN RECEIPT as to 951 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 2/19/17 in transit to destination per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 375 USCA NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING: 946 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Mey. Fourth Circuit USCA Case Number: 17-1222. Case Manager: Richard H. Sewell 804-916-2702. (jss) Modified on 2/22/2017 (Regenerated NEF to verify service to Honeywell International Inc and and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 374 BILL OF COSTS by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Transcript costs, #2 Exhibit Exh B - document costs)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/27/2017 10:00 AM in Wheeling Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 373 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (210 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 420 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 205 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 432 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 214 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 227 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 688 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 460 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 496 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 464 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 443 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 368 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 705 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 946 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 198 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 284 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 259 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 231 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 535 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 174 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 414 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 176 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 176 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 104 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 245 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 476 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 210 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 454 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 260 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 316 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES) Notice of Appeal (jss) Modified on 2/22/2017 (Regenerated NEF to verify service to Honeywell International Inc and and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 372 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The non-partys 935 Objections are DENIED as moot. The 940 Order setting the hearing is VACATED and the hearing set for February 16, 2017 is CANCELLED. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 371 WRONG EVENT USED - REFILED AS DE 953 TRANSMISSION OF NOTICE OF APPEAL AND DOCKET SHEET TO US COURT OF APPEALS: NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to (467 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 217 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 339 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 216 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 255 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 447 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 287 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 231 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 391 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 145 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 227 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 147 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 506 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 75 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 659 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 914 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 181 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 147 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 201 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 185 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 196 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 176 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 403 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 676 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 425 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 431 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 168 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 385 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 435 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 414 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 181 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES) Clerk's Judgment, (144 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 144 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 146 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 146 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 215 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 215 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 167 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 167 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 254 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 254 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 384 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 384 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 424 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 424 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 675 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 675 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 175 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 175 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 200 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 200 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 230 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 230 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 505 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 505 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 446 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 446 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 195 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 195 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 390 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 390 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 338 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 338 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 430 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 430 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 402 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 402 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 216 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 216 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 226 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 226 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 286 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 286 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 184 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 184 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 146 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 146 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 434 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 434 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 413 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 413 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 74 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 74 in 5:16-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 180 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 180 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 180 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 180 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 658 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 658 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 913 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 913 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 466 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 466 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES) Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Diana Mey. Filing fee $ 505. (jss) Modified on 2/16/2017 - regenerated NEF (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees in Connection with Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents 944 shall be held Monday, February 27, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., in the Magistrate JudgeCourtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 2/15/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 369 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number WVNW001622 re ( 946 Notice of Appeal 1 13 md 2493 et al.) Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Mey (kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 368 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (913 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 913 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b),,, (914 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Clerk's Judgment, by Diana Mey. (Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 367 RETURN RECEIPT as to 940 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 2/11/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 366 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Document by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Jonathan R. Marshall Declaration, #2 Beth E. Terrell Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 365 RETURN RECEIPT as to 940 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 2/6/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Objections to Plaintiffs Third Amended Notice of Deposition of Levincent Nealy Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) 935 shall be heldThursday, February 16, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., in the Magistrate Judge Courtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 2/2/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 363 RETURN RECEIPT as to 920 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 1/28/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 362 RETURN RECEIPT as to (920 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 1/28/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 361 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Notice of Deposition of Mike Haislip pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 360 RETURN RECEIPT as to 917 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES as to Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 1/28/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 359 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LEVINCENT NEALY PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(B)(1) re 922 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, et al. by LaVincent Nealy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 358 RETURN RECEIPT as to 913 and 914 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 1/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 1/31/2017 added de 914 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 357 RETURN RECEIPT as to 917 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 1/26/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 1/31/2017 - removed extra date (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 356 RETURN RECEIPT as to 917 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 1/26/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 355 RETURN RECEIPT as to 913 and 914 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 1/21/17 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 1/31/2017 - added de 913 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 354 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 894 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order, Returned as Undeliverable/Not Deliverable as addressed/Unable to Forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 26, 2017 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc., Telephone Consumer Protection Act Litigation Objectiions to Notices of Deposition. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 352 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Notice of Deposition of Bruce Mungiguerra pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 351 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Notice of Deposition of Travis Miller pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 350 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 349 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Deposition of Travis Miller pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 348 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Deposition of Mike Haislip pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 347 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of LaVincent Nealy pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 346 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Deposition of Bruce Mungiguerra pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff filed a Motion to Compel. ECF No. 767. It is also docketed in 1:14CV64. ECF No. 297. Plaintiff and Defendant Versatile resolved the matter and advised the Court the motion is moot. ECF No. 805. The Court denies [ECF No. 767] in this action and [ECF No. 297] in 1:14CV64 as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 01/25/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jlk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 344 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 895 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 23, 2017 Filing 343 RETURN RECEIPT as to 913 and 914 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/19/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 916 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff's deadline to apply for fees and expenses is extended to and including February 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 1/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 341 MOTION Extend Deadline Contained in the Court's December 9, 2016 Order by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 340 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Fourth Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition of Monitronics International, Inc.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 17, 2017 Filing 339 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Honeywell International, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. Signed by Clerk of Court on 1/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING UTC FIRE AND SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC. AND HONEYWELL INTERNATION INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT: The 911 Motion is granted and the Clerk is ordered to enter final judgment in favor of defendants UTCFS and Honeywell. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 13, 2017 Filing 337 Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., and Honeywell International Inc.'s Unopposed Joint Motion For Entry of Final Judgmetn by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Their Unopposed Joint Motion For Entry of Final Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. and Honeywell International Inc.'s Motion For Entry of Final Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Wilmoth, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 336 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Second Amended) Travis Miller 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 335 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Second Amended) Mike Haislip 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 334 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Second Amended) LaVincent Nealy 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 333 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Second Amended) Bruce Mungiguerra 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 332 RETURN RECEIPT as to 894 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 12/27/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 3, 2017 Filing 331 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 885 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 30, 2016 Filing 330 RETURN RECEIPT (Craig Cunningham) as to 894 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/27/2016 (per USPS website). Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 30, 2016 Filing 329 RETURN RECEIPT as to 895 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 12/27/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Filing 328 RETURN RECEIPT as to 895 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 12/27/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 27, 2016 Filing 327 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham ( 862 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Returned as Undeliverable. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING JOINT 893 MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES CONTAINED IN THE COURT'S DECEMBER 9, 2016 ORDER: The Court hereby extends the deadline for production of documents required by the December 9, 2016 Order to and including January 13, 2017, and extends the deadline for Plaintiffs to apply for fees and expenses to and including January 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 12/23/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac)(Copy to pro se parties via cm/rrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment ( 735 in 1:13-md-2493 ALL) and Defendant Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment ( 761 in 1:13-md-2493 ALL) are GRANTED. Defendants UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. and Honeywell International, Inc. are DISMISSED from these actions. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac)(Copy to pro se parties by cm/rrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 324 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents Pursuant to the Court's December 9, 2016 Order by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 16, 2016 Filing 323 RETURN RECEIPT as to 885 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/13/2016 (per USPS website). Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 322 RETURN RECEIPT as to 885 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 12/13/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 321 Mail sent to 853 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER : The Plaintiffs 796 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Defendant Monitronics is ORDERED to produce the documents at issue without any redactions based on relevancy by December 20, 2016. The moving part is ORDERED to file an affidavit of reasonable expenses within 14 days. Any party may, within fourteen days of this Order, file with the Clerk of the Court written objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 12/9/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Filing 319 RETURN RECEIPT as to 878 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/5/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 318 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/2016, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Mullen, Telephone number (304) 234-3987. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(lsm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 317 RETURN RECEIPT as to 878 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/3/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 316 RETURN RECEIPT as to 878 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/2/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 315 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Lavincent Nealy Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING (877) MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT MARKED AS CONFIDENTIAL in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL RELATED CASES. The Clerk of Court shall seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Submission (Dkt. No. 874 ). Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 313 MOTION to Seal Exhibit Marked Confidential re (874 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Other Document, (Response to Supplemental Submission of Monitronics International, Inc.) by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 312 Mail sent to Michael C. Worsham 855 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. Returned as Undeliverable/Return to Sender/Insufficient Address/Unable to Forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 311 RETURN RECEIPT as to 862 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 11/23/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 23, 2016 Filing 310 Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Submission of Monitronics International, Inc. Other Document re (796 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 309 RETURN RECEIPT as to 839 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Paperless Order on Motion to Continue. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 11/18/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 308 SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC., IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION TO COMPEL Other Document re (331 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 239 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 76 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 406 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 126 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 335 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 66 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 796 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 187 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 155 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 96 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 367 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 131 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 303 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 347 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 325 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 279 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 47 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 85 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 291 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 576 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 47 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 314 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 99 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 45 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 117 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 553 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 116 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 307 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended) Travis Miller 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended) Mike Haislip 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended) LaVincent Nealy 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 304 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Fourth Amended) 30(b)(6) Deposition of Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE by Diana Mey (Amended) Bruce Mungiguerra 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 302 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Motions Hearing/Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/17/2016 re 735 and 761 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment; and 681 MOTION to Dismiss. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(soa) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Mediation Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties filed 860 stipulations advising the Court that they have resolved their discovery dispute and the moving party waives the right to reasonable expenses if any. Accordingly, the 819 Motion is DENIED AS MOOT and the 826 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing and Argument is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 11/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) Modified on 11/17/2016 - certified mail to: Reo 7016 0910 0002 1379 3049; Cunningham 7016 0910 0002 1379 3056; and Worsham 7016 0910 0002 1379 3032. (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 16, 2016 Filing 299 RETURN RECEIPT as to 853 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 11/12/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 16, 2016 Filing 298 STIPULATION re (819 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION For Spoliation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 297 RETURN RECEIPT (Michael Worsham) as to (842 in 1:13-md-2493 ALL) Text Only Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 296 RETURN RECEIPT (Bryan Anthony Reo) as to (855 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL) Text Only Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/12/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 TEXT ONLY ORDER: At the request of counsel the evidentiary hearing and argument set for tomorrow regarding 819 Motion For Spoliation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. is continued until 11/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 11/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) Modified on 11/9/2016 (jss) - sent certified mail to Worsham 7016 0910 0002 1379 2974, Cunningham 7016 0910 0002 1379 2981 and Reo 7016 0910 0002 1379 2998. [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 294 RETURN RECEIPT as to 842 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 11/5/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: re (761 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc., (735 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, Motion for Summary Judgment by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. (681 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 2 Gig Technology. Oral argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment is hereby set for Thursday, November 17, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in the Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/9/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. re (309 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 134 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 205 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 321 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 149 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 135 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 117 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 99 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 594 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 332 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 84 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 343 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 816 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 298 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 114 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 65 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 349 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 353 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 572 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 424 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 365 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 65 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 257 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 385 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 94 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 63 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 99 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 173 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 144 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 103 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES) Notice (Other) OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF FRCP 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 291 RETURN RECEIPT as to 842 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 11/5/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Filing 290 RETURN RECEIPT as to ( 839 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/4/2016 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Filing 289 RETURN RECEIPT as to (839 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 288 REPLY to Response to Motion re (66 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES) MOTION For Spoliation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 287 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Mike Haislip 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 286 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Travis Miller 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 285 NOTICE by Diana Mey of LaVincent Nealy 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 284 NOTICE by Diana Mey of Bruce Mungiguerra 30(b)(1) Deposition Notice Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 283 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Expert Disclosure. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 841 Motion to Continue in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES (and associated cases). The hearing is rescheduled for Thursday November 10, 2016 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 281 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Scheduled for November 2, 2016 by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, ALLIANCE SECURITY, INC., Alliance Security LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 280 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, ALLIANCE SECURITY, INC., Alliance Security LLC Plaintiffs and Defendant Alliance Security, Inc.'s Joint Request to Reschedule Hearing. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice 838 Motion to Continue in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES (and all associated cases) for failure to comply with LR Gen P 88.02. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 30, 2016 Filing 278 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing scheduled for November 2, 2016 by Alliance Security, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 28, 2016 Filing 277 RESPONSE to Motion re (147 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 68 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 388 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 120 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 301 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 356 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 66 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 68 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 97 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 346 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 102 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 335 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 324 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 312 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 260 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 106 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 819 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 137 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 138 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 352 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 208 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 575 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 176 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 368 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 427 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 152 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 117 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 102 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 87 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 597 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES) MOTION For Spoliation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. filed by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, ALLIANCE SECURITY, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Teare, John)[Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 27, 2016 Filing 276 RETURN RECEIPT as to 815 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Paperless Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 10/25/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 275 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert: Evidentiary Hearing re 767 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES (ALL) and 796 in 1:13-md- 02493-JPB-JES (ALL) MOTIONS to Compel held on 10/25/2016. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 274 RETURN RECEIPT as to 826 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES and 824 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 10/21/16 per USPS website. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 273 RETURN RECEIPT as to 826 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 10/21/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) Modified on 10/24/2016 replaced document, corrected linkage and regenerated NEF (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 272 RETURN RECEIPT as to 824 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael C. Worsham on 10/21/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 271 RETURN RECEIPT as to 826 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 11/20/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 270 RETURN RECEIPT as to 824 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 10/20/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 269 REPLY to Response to Motion re (331 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 239 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 76 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 406 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 126 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 335 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 66 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 796 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 187 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 155 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 96 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 367 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 131 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 303 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 347 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 279 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 325 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 47 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 85 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 291 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 576 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 47 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 314 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 99 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 45 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 117 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 553 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 116 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents filed by Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of Motion to Compel regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents, #2 Exhibit 36 to Supplemental Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of Motion to Compel regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Filing 267 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Plaintiffs Motion For Spoilation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. 819 shall be held Wednesday, November 2, 2016, at 9:30 a.m., in the Magistrate Judge Courtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, UnitedStates Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 10/17/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting (818) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Expert Witness Disclosure is due on 10/31/16 for Plaintiff and 3/20/17 for Defendant. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/17/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 268 RETURN RECEIPT as to (815 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES ALL Text Only Order). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 12, 2016 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Disclosure of Call Records. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 12, 2016 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Expert Disclosure. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 260 MOTION For Spoliation Sanctions Against Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 259 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Disclosure by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The hearing regarding Plaintiffs 767 Motion to Compel is continued from October 18, 2016, to October 25, 2016, at 1:15 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 10/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (796 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 406 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 576 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 347 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 325 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 553 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 335 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 314 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 303 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 291 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 279 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 367 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 239 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 187 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 155 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 117 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 116 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 131 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 126 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 96 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 331 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 76 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 85 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 99 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 66 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 47 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 47 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 45 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/25/2016 at 1:15 PM in Wheeling Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 257 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 814 for extension of time. The hearing is now set for 1:15 PM October 25,2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 10/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(tjw) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 255 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (331 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 239 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 76 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 406 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 126 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 335 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 66 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 796 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 187 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 155 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 96 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 367 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 131 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 303 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 347 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 279 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 325 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 47 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 85 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 291 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 576 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 47 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 314 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 81 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 99 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 45 in 5:16-cv-00133-JPB-JES, 117 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 553 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 116 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey)[Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 254 RETURN RECEIPT (Michael Worsham) as to (806 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. for service of Gomez declaration and sealed exhibits thereto. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 4, 2016 Filing 251 REPLY to Response to Motion re (547 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 57 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 101 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 379 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 99 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 298 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 302 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 54 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 308 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 320 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 212 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 90 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 264 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 287 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 69 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 19 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 519 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 54 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 35 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 340 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 735 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 18 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 72 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 276 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 160 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 128 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES, 49 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 88 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES) MOTION for summary judgment filed by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supp. Decl. of A. Gomez (public form))Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Wilmoth, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 250 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 249 RETURN RECEIPT as to (806 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT: An evidentiary hearing and argument on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics Production of Redacted Documents 796 shall be held Tuesday, October 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in the Magistrate Judge Courtroom, Room 433, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 9/18/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 28, 2016 Filing 247 NOTICE by Diana Mey re (767 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION to Compel Defendant VMS/Alliance to Supplement its Discovery Responses and Document Production to Include Documents and Information Generated or Created from 2013 Through the Present Notice of Agreement on Discovery Dispute Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 246 RETURN RECEIPT as to 794 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 9/24/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 245 RETURN RECEIPT as to 792 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 9/24/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 244 RETURN RECEIPT as to 794 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 9/23/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 243 RETURN RECEIPT as to 792 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES,. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 9/23/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 242 RETURN RECEIPT as to 789 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 9/22/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 241 RETURN RECEIPT as to 789 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Anthony Reo on 9/21/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 22, 2016 Filing 239 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant Monitronics' Production of Redacted Documents by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-7, #3 Exhibit 8-14, #4 Exhibit 15-33, #5 Exhibit 34-35)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting (791) Motion to Seal in case 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, et al and the exhibits and memorandum are deemed filed under seal as attached to the motion and do not need refilled. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/20/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 20, 2016 Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re (101 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 302 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-JES, 90 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-JES, 264 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-JES, 519 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 547 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 298 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-JES, 308 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-JES, 19 in 1:16-cv-00105-JPB-JES, 18 in 5:16-cv-00129-JPB-JES, 72 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 49 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB-JES, 379 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-JES, 99 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-JES, 246 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-JES, 54 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB-JES, 320 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-JES, 287 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-JES, 69 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-JES, 35 in 5:16-cv-00127-JPB-JES, 735 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES, 88 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-JES, 57 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-JES, 212 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-JES, 54 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-JES, 340 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-JES, 276 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-JES, 160 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-JES, 128 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-JES) MOTION, (761 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES) MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Honeywell and UTC's Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Marshall in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Honeywell and UTC's Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12 (sealed per 27 Protective Order in MDL 1:13md2493), #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106, #108 Exhibit 107, #109 Exhibit 108, #110 Exhibit 109, #111 Exhibit 110, #112 Exhibit 111, #113 Exhibit 112, #114 Exhibit 113 (sealed per 27 Protective Order in MDL 1:13md2493), #115 Exhibit 114, #116 Exhibit 115, #117 Exhibit 116, #118 Exhibit 117, #119 Exhibit 118, #120 Exhibit 119, #121 Exhibit 120, #122 Exhibit 121, #123 Exhibit 122, #124 Exhibit 123, #125 Exhibit 124)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) Modified on 9/28/2016 (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND MEET AND CONFER DEADLINE IN PART: The parties and counsel shall meet and confer in person on Plaintiffs 767 Motion to Compel on or before September 29, 2016. The parties shall file a joint pleading listing the items still in dispute and the position of eachparty on or before October 6, 2016. The evidentiary hearing and argument on the motion is CONTINUED until October 18,2016, at 10:00 a.m, in the Magistrate Judge Courtroom, Room 433, United States Courthouse, Twelfth and Chapline Streets, Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 9/20/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 234 MOTION to Extend Meet & Confer Deadline by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting (586) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:13md2493. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/19/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 232 RETURN RECEIPT as to 771 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/15/16 as to Michael Worsham. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 231 RETURN RECEIPT as to (391 in 771 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 9/15/16. per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 16, 2016 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 15, 2016 Filing 229 RETURN RECEIPT as to 770 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/12/16 per USPS website. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 14, 2016 Filing 228 RETURN RECEIPT as to 770 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Reo on 9/12/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 13, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Grove on behalf of Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Grove, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 226 Other Document List of Plaintiffs in the Case filed by Jason Bennett, Phillip J. Charvat, Scott Dolemba, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Disclosure of Call Records. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES AND COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE A REPORT WITH THE COURT: On or before Monday, September 26, 2016, counsel shall provide a joint pleading listing the items still in dispute and the position of each party as to each item still disputed. Evidentiary Hearing shall be held on 9/30/2016 at 10:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 9/12/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-JES et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER OF REFERRAL: This Court ORDERS that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter be REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert, who is hereby designated and authorized to consider the record and do all things proper to decide this motion 767 and any other non-dispositive, pre-trial motions filed in this case, excluding motions in limine. The magistrate judge referral in this matter is hereby REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Seibert. Magistrate Judge Aloi is hereby relieved from conducting any further business related to this matter. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/9/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 222 MOTION to Compel Defendant VMS/Alliance to Supplement its Discovery Responses and Document Production to Include Documents and Information Generated or Created from 2013 Through the Present by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Marshall, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' response to Defendant UTC's motion for summary judgment is due September 20, 2016. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Filing 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct (713 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 713 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 713 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and Social Security Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Of Change of Attorney Information for Margaret J. Carlson Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) (Main Document 754 replaced on 8/25/2016) (kd). Modified on 8/25/2016 to attach the document as a non-fillable form (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Filing 218 RESPONSE by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, ALLIANCE SECURITY, INC., Alliance Security LLC to (92 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA) Other Document. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Filing 217 RESPONSE by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, ALLIANCE SECURITY, INC., Alliance Security LLC to (368 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA) Other Document. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 216 Other Document Plaintiffs' Sixth Supplemental Statement filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 19, 2016 Filing 215 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 212 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William D. Wilmoth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Angelita Gomez, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G, #17 Exhibit H, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit K, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al. DOCKET CORRECTION: Document refiled to spread to all member cases.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM IN REDACTED PUBLIC FORM by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. re (733 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Wilmoth, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 210 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shane Meyers. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 209 RETURN RECEIPT to Michael C. Worsham as to (713 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 334 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 292 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 541 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 206 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 66 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 48 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 82 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 93 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 93 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 51 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 314 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 511 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 281 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 122 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 154 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 63 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA, 270 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 258 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 48 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 295 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 84 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA, 238 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 302 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 373 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 43 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB) Order, SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/28/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) Modified on 8/8/2016 to remove duplicate docket text (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 208 RETURN RECEIPT to Bryan Anthony Reo as to (713 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 334 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 292 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 541 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 206 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 66 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 48 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 82 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 93 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 93 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 51 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 314 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 511 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 281 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 122 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 154 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 63 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA, 270 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 258 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 48 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 295 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 84 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA, 238 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 302 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 373 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 43 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB) Order . SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) Modified on 8/8/2016 to remove duplicate docket text (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/26/2016, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Mullen, Telephone number (304) 234-3987. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 8/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(lsm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE: Motions for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2016; Responses by 9/6/16; Replies 9/20/16. Expert Designations for plaintiff due by 10/12/2016 and for Defendants by 2/28/17. Discovery due by 4/28/2017. Motions for Class Certification due by 5/26/17; Response by 6/26/17; Replies by 7/14/17 and Hearing on Class Certification Motion set for 7/25/2017 09:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/26/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 205 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Status Conference held on 7/26/2016 and a new Scheduling Order will issue. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(bjt) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 204 REPLY to Response to Motion re (700 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 286 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to compel Production of Responsive Documents filed by Edith Bowler, Phillip J. Charvat, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM Regardign Proposed Case Management Schedule by Monitronics International, Inc. re (264 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 76 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 285 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 273 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 105 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 41 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 315 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 26 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 189 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 241 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 65 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 275 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 75 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 253 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 356 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 34 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 297 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 215 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 490 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 31 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 31 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 67 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA, 137 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 524 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 670 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 43 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA) MEMORANDUM . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 202 RESPONSE by Honeywell International, Inc. to (692 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) MEMORANDUM,,,. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Fenwick, Carrie) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 201 Other Document Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Statement filed by Phillip J. Charvat, Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 18, 2016 Filing 200 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 199 RETURN RECEIPT as to 677 , 678 , 679 and 680 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Bryan Reo on 7/5/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM (Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Schedule) by Yvette Corralez-Estrada-Diaz, Bryan Anthony Reo, STEWART N. ABRAMSON, Michael C. Worsham, Brandon Frazer, Keith Finklea, Darren R. Newhart, Lawrence Tarizzo, Newton Vaughan, Craig Cunningham, Scott Dolemba, Diana Mey, Allen Beavers, Dakota Dalton, Diane Elder, Michelle Wakeley, Sandra Fairley, James Giles, Todd C. Bank, Jason Bennett, Edith Bowler, Phillip J. Charvat, Kenneth Clark, Scott Dolemba, Keith Finklea, JOHN GERACI, Bill Garcia, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, James G Hough, Stewart McCaw, Merrill Primack(on behalf of himself and the class members defined herein), Lawrence Tarizzo, Todd C. Bank, Diana Mey, Scott Dolemba, Jason Bennett re (668 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) MEMORANDUM,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 197 RETURN RECEIPT as to 679 and 680 Orders (Michael Worsham). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 196 RETURN RECEIPT as to 679 and 680 Orders (Craig Cunningham). SERVICE ACCEPTED: no service date. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 195 RETURN RECEIPT as to 677 Order (Michael Worsham). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 194 RETURN RECEIPT as to 677 Order (Craig Cunningham) - no service date entered. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDED ORDER SETTING STATUS: The Status conference is hereby CONTINUED to July 26, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in the Wheeling District JudgeCourtroom, North, before Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/27/16 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Order denying without prejudice the Motion for Class Certification, or in the Alternative, to Stay Briefing Pending Completion of Discovery. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/27/16. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: An In-person Status Conference is hereby set for Saturday, July 16, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in the Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/27/2016. DUE TO A TECHNICAL PROBLEM WITH CM/ECF, this order has been re-docketed to verify that all parties have received notice. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: An in-person Status Conference is hereby set for Saturday, July 16, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in the Wheeling District JudgeCourtroom, North, before Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/27/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) (jss). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2016: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss). Modified on 6/27/2016 - added documents and regenerated NEF (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM by UTC Fire and Security Americas Corp., Inc. re (660 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) Order Lifting Stay,, addressing the Spokeo decision and proposed case developement. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Wilmoth, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 189 MEMORANDUM by Monitronics International, Inc. re (660 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) Order Lifting Stay,, . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM of Law Concerning the Impact of the Supreme Court Spokeo Decision and its Proposed Case Management Schedule by Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC, Alliance Security Inc. . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM Regarding Spokeo, Inc. v. Robins by all plaintiffs re (68 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 279 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 20 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 235 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 350 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 518 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 158 in 1:14-cv-00185-JPB-JSK, 269 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 183 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 59 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 309 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 31 in 1:16-cv-00010-JPB-MJA, 35 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA, 291 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 660 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 258 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 28 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 25 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 209 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 99 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 267 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 247 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 32 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 484 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 24 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 70 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 131 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 61 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA) Order Lifting Stay, . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(Terrell, Beth) At counsel request, modified on 6/23/2016 to correct filing plaintiffs in docket text , NEF Regenerated (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 14, 2016 Filing 186 RETURN RECEIPT as to (68 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 279 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 20 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 258 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 28 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 25 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 235 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 350 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 209 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 518 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 158 in 1:14-cv-00185-JPB-JSK, 99 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 269 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 183 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 59 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 309 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 267 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 247 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 31 in 1:16-cv-00010-JPB-MJA, 35 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA, 32 in 5:16-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 484 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 24 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 291 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 70 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 131 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 61 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA, 660 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA) Order Lifting Stay. SERVICE ACCEPTED on: no service date. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2016 Filing 185 RETURN RECEIPT as to (660 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, et al) Order Lifting Stay. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/10/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2016 Filing 184 RETURN RECEIPT as to (208 in 1:14-cv-00162-JPB-MJA, 257 in 1:14-cv-00064-JPB-MJA, 67 in 1:15-cv-00225-JPB-MJA, 32 in 1:15-cv-00238-JPB-MJA, 19 in 1:16-cv-00036-JPB, 98 in 1:15-cv-00100-JPB-MJA, 60 in 1:15-cv-00137-JPB-MJA, 349 in 1:13-cv-00263-JPB-MJA, 290 in 1:14-cv-00034-JPB-MJA, 246 in 1:14-cv-00082-JPB-MJA, 182 in 1:14-cv-00215-JPB-MJA, 268 in 1:14-cv-00054-JPB-MJA, 517 in 5:11-cv-00090-JPB-MJA, 67 in 1:15-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 23 in 1:16-cv-00014-JPB-MJA, 266 in 1:14-cv-00020-JPB-MJA, 58 in 1:15-cv-00161-JPB-MJA, 157 in 1:14-cv-00185-JPB-JSK, 24 in 1:16-cv-00035-JPB, 278 in 1:14-cv-00066-JPB-MJA, 308 in 1:14-cv-00169-JPB-MJA, 130 in 1:15-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 483 in 1:14-cv-00059-JPB-MJA, 234 in 1:14-cv-00087-JPB-MJA, 30 in 1:16-cv-00010-JPB-MJA, 653 in 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA, 27 in 1:16-cv-00090-JPB-MJA) Order Reassigning Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: This Court ORDERS the parties to file briefs not to exceed fifteen (15)pages explaining how the Supreme Courts decision affects their respective positions and opining as to how this Court should proceed in the matter. These briefs are due within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order. As a final matter, the stay in this matter is hereby LIFTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/8/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-JPB-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION: Ordered that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable John Bailey for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair for the Panel on 6/2/16) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Filing 181 RETURN RECEIPT as to 644 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA, et al Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham - date of delivery blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 25, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Firm Name Change Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Withdraw as counsel. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Jeffrey Poston, Rebecca Baden Chaney, and the Law Firm of Crowell & Moring LLP from the list of counsel in this case. Motions terminated in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA #643 in case 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-MJA in case 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00100-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00137-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00161-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00169-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00225-IMK-MJA in case 1:15-cv-00238-IMK-MJA in case 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-MJA in case 1:16-cv-00010-IMK-MJA in case 1:16-cv-00014-IMK-MJA in case 1:16-cv-00035-IMK in case 1:16-cv-00036-IMK in case 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 19, 2016 Filing 178 MOTION For leave for Jeffrey Poston, Rebecca Chaney and Crowell & Moring to withdraw as counsel for UTC Fire and Security Americas, by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order granting leave)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 19, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE by UTC Fire and America's Corporation Notice of Appareance of Becca J. Wahquist as counsel Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Filing 176 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 2, 2016 Filing 175 Other Document Notice By All Parties Regarding Lack of Unanimous Consent to Remittal filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 21, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Goodwin Fenwick on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Fenwick, Carrie) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc., UTC Fire and America's Corporation for proceedings held on January 13, 2016 before Judge Irene M. Keeley. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(llb) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Honeywell International, Inc. for proceedings held on January 13, 2016 before Judge Irene M. Keeley. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(llb) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 13, 2016, before Judge Irene M. Keeley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Bachman, Telephone number (304) 282-0395; Linda_Bachman@wvnd.uscourts.gov. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 2/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(llb) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 14, 2016 Filing 170 RETURN RECEIPT as to ( 603 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA, et al) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED by Craig Cunningham - date of delivery blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 13, 2016 Filing 169 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge Irene M. Keeley. Status Conference held on 1/13/2016. (Court Reporter Linda Bachman) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(dk) (Main Document 606 replaced to correct time in court on 1/14/2016) (dk). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court SCHEDULES a status conference bytelephone on Wednesday, January 13, 2016, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/7/16. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 6, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey A. Holmstrand Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) (Main Document 600 replaced with flattened (non-fillable)version on 1/6/2016) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 28, 2015 Filing 166 RETURN RECEIPT for Michael Worsham as to 585 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA, Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/19/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 21, 2015 Filing 164 RETURN RECEIPT for Craig Cunningham as to 585 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA. SERVICE ACCEPTED - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 18, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Teare, Jr. on behalf of Alliance Security Inc. (DOCKET CORRECTION: This entry was filed only in the lead case and one member case, 1:13MD2493 docket entry 590. It is now filed also in the cases to which it relates) (kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting (496) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Court grants the motion and relieves Clifford F. Kinney, Jr. as counsel of record in this civil action. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/15/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2015 Filing 162 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Clifford F. Kinney, Jr. only) by Alliance Security, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 9, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE by Edith Bowler, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin of Firm Name and Email Address Change Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Reiten, Mary) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 9, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE by Edith Bowler, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin of Firm Name and Email Address Change Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying as moot (570) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 12/1/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Security for Alliance Security Inc.s' Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production and Second Set of Interrogatories. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 24, 2015 Filing 156 RETURN RECEIPT as to #571 Order to Show Cause in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA. SERVICE ACCEPTED - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 23, 2015 Filing 155 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security LLC as to (262 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-MJA, 154 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-MJA, 102 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-MJA, 321 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-MJA, 206 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-MJA, 488 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-MJA, 32 in 1:15-cv-00137-IMK-MJA, 571 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA, 240 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-MJA, 250 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-MJA, 178 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-MJA, 39 in 1:15-cv-00169-IMK-MJA, 299 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-MJA, 30 in 1:15-cv-00161-IMK-MJA, 280 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-MJA, 218 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-MJA, 452 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-MJA, 156 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-MJA, 229 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-MJA, 228 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-MJA, 70 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK-MJA) Order to Show Cause, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIANCE: This Court hereby ORDERS counsel for Defendant Alliance to SHOW CAUSE on or before November 23, 2015, as to why it has failed to answer Plaintiffs third set of discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/17/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
November 12, 2015 Filing 153 Second MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 23, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beth E. Terrell Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-MJA et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 2, 2015 Filing 151 Case Referral Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael Aloi, per Order entered 10/1/2015 in 3:15-mc-29. Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull no longer assigned to the case. Copy of NEF and MC Order to pro se party by regular mail. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 9, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 3, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 3, 2015 Filing 147 RETURN RECEIPT as to 536 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/31/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denies (516) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK and defendant Alliance will answer Plaintiff's Third Set of Discovery thirty days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 8/28/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 28, 2015 Filing 145 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 20, 2015 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 13, 2015 Filing 143 RESPONSE to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security LLC, Alliance Security LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 13, 2015 Filing 142 INCORRECTLY FILED IN MEMBER CASE 1:14CV215, RELATES ONLY TO MEMBER CASE 1:14CV158. BILL OF COSTS by Vincent Brizgys, Jonathan Mraunac, Nicholas Shreders. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Edelman, Daniel) Modified on 9/1/2015 to correct case numbers (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 141 Other Document STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S JULY 31, 2015 ORDER filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 4, 2015 Filing 140 MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #510 Motion to Enforce Stipulation and ORDERS that Monitornics must produce the stipulated privilege log by August 5, 2015, or show just cause, in writing, why it has not complied with its obligation under the stipulation as alleged. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 7/31/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Stipulation by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 29, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 17, 2015 Filing 136 Mail sent to Timmy J. Tolmes ( 425 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) Order on Motion to Intervene - Returned as Undeliverable/Unclaimed/Unable to Forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 7, 2015 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Third Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 134 Other Document Supplemental Statement of Plaintiff Stewart N. Abramson filed by STEWART N. ABRAMSON. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 29, 2015 Filing 133 RETURN RECEIPT as to (462 in 1:13-cv-002493-IMK-JSK) Order Staying Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham - date of delivery blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 26, 2015 Filing 132 FILED IN WRONG CASE. Document correctly filed as docket entry 245 in 1:14cv20 and docket entry 492 in 1:13MD2493. Modified on 6/29/2015 (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE by Jonathan Mraunac of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Edelman, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 130 NOTICE by Nicholas Shreders of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Edelman, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE by Vincent Brizgys of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Edelman, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 22, 2015 Filing 128 Mail sent to Shawna Farley (115 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK,, 246 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 425 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 128 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 265 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 159 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 219 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 171 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 203 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 55 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 205 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 182 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 441 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 107 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 401 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 108 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 173 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK) Order on Motion to Intervene, Returned as Undeliverable: Not deliverable as addressed unable to forward. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Discovery to Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER STAYING CASE: Court ADOPTS the proposed stipulation #457 , STAYS the MDL until the Supreme Court decides or otherwise disposes of Campbell-Ewald and Spokeo, and DENIES AS MOOT the pending motion to stay filed by the defendants #419 . The stay is subject to the exceptions outlined in the parties proposed stipulation #457 , and in no way affects the Courts power to approve any proposed settlements and enter judgments. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss)(copy to Cunningham Certified mail 7014 2870 0001 0202 5755) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2015: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss). (Main Document 462 replaced on 6/17/2015) (jss). Modified on 6/18/2015 to correct motion docket entry no. (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 124 RETURN RECEIPT as to Order on Motion to Intervene. The date of delivery on the card is blank. (115 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 246 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 425 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 128 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 265 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 159 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 219 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 171 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 203 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 55 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 205 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 182 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 441 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 107 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 401 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 108 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 173 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK). Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 123 STIPULATION Proposed Stipulation by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2015 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re (199 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 155 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 242 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 211 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 124 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 397 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 169 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 419 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 437 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 104 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 167 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 127 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 188 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 178 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 199 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 261 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 111 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK) Joint MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Address Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on the Current Record filed by Honeywell International, Inc., ISI Alarms NC Inc., Monitronics International, Inc., Telephone Consumer Protection Act Litigation, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc., Versatile Marketing Solutions, Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 12, 2015 Filing 120 RETURN RECEIPT as to (425 in 1:13md2493) Order on Motion to Intervene. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Michael M. Dixon on 6/8/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Second Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. (DOCKET CORRECTION: This entry was filed in the lead case, 1:13MD2493 docket entry 444. The document states it relates to all cases, however, it was not spread to all cases. It is now filed in all the cases to which it relates.) (kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Anya Verkhovskaya. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey A. Hansen. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Deposition Notice of Douglas E. Forrest. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 116 RETURN RECEIPT as to (425 in 1:13md2493) Order on Motion to Intervene. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham, Wade Albright, Amber Lambert, Quiana Lovett, April Juarez and Mary Lyn Danielak on 6/8/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 115 RETURN RECEIPT as to (425 in 1:13md2493) Order on Motion to Intervene. SERVICE ACCEPTED a to Chelsey Penix, Katheleen Jennings, Tenesha Hardy and Shawna Farly - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 113 RETURN RECEIPT as to 428 Order (ALL CASES). SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 6/6/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 8, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re (199 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 155 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 242 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 211 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 124 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 397 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 169 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 419 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 437 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 104 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 167 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 127 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 188 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 178 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 199 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 261 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 111 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK) Joint MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Address Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on the Current Record filed by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Marshall)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court conducted a status conference during which it: GRANTED IN PART the joint motion to withdraw as counsel for ISI #253 as to Alec Sedki and John F. Kennedy and DENIED IN PART the motion as to Robert B. Newkirk III, and the Newkirk Law Firm, who will remain as counsel of record; GRANTED IN PART the motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Harry F. Bell, Jr., and the Bell Law Firm PLLC in 1:14CV59 #310 as to defendant ISI, and DENIED IN PART the motion as to defendants Kevin Klink and Jayson Waller; DENIED the pro se motion to intervene #370 for the reasons stated on the record and in the Order Denying Pro Se Motion to Intervene #425 . ORDERED the parties to brief the joint motion to stay #420 according to the following agreed expedited schedule: the plaintiffs response brief due by Monday, June 8, 2015; the defendants reply due by Friday, June 12, 2015; and the Court to issue its ruling no later than Friday, June 19, 2015. ORDERED that briefing on the plaintiffs motion for class certification #417 be stayed pending the decision on the motion to stay. Monitronics will provide a privilege log regarding all documents it has produced to date by June 10, 2015; Monitronics will produce all documents responsive to the plaintiffs' discovery requests to date by June 17, 2015; and Monitronics will provide a privilege log for any additional documents not listed on the June 10 privilege log by June 22, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/3/15.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2015 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production and Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying ]370] Pro Se Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/3/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 106 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge Irene M. Keeley. Status Conference held on 6/1/2015. (Court Reporter Linda Bachman) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Supplemental Statement in Response to Plaintiff Diana Mey's Fourth Supplemental Statement Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 29, 2015 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Monitronics International, Inc. re (199 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 155 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 242 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 211 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 124 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 397 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 169 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 419 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 437 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 104 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 167 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 127 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 188 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 178 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 199 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 261 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 111 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK) Joint MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Address Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on the Current Record . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 29, 2015 Filing 103 Joint MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Address Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on the Current Record by Monitronics International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 101 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification or, in the Alternative, to Stay Briefing Pending Completion of Discovery by Edith Bowler, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, James G Hough. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of John W. Barrett in Support of Motion)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Terrell, Beth) Modified on 6/18/2015 - unterminated motion (jss). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 19, 2015 Filing 100 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 12, 2015 Filing 99 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 98 RETURN RECEIPT as to 428 ORDER in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK (ALL CASES). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Cancellation of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 96 Other Document Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Statement filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fed.R.Civ.P.26 Expert Disclosure Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting (427) Second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Witness Disclosures. Plaintiffs shall serve their expert witness disclosures by 5/1/15. (copy pro se Certified mail) Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/1/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 93 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Disclosure by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 27, 2015 Filing 92 RETURN RECEIPT as to 1:13md2493 ALL CASES #398 Memorandum & Opinion. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Craig Cunningham on 4/24/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AGREED ORDER RESOLVING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER FOR DISCOVERY FROM ISI ALARMS NC, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 4/22/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 22, 2015 Filing 90 RESPONSE by Diana Mey to (398 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) Memorandum & Opinion,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER/OPINION: ORDERED that within twenty-four (24) hours from entry of this Order/Opinion, the parties shall provide to the Court in writing their proposed resolution to this matter. Should the parties fail to provide such to the Court within that time period, the undersigned shall forthwith issue Order disposing of Plaintiffs motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CANCELLING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Court's Order for Discovery from ISI Alarms NC, Inc., scheduled for today, April 21, 2015, at 1:00 p.m., is CANCELLED. An order ruling on said motion will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 4/21/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al. (kd)(Copy pro se parties/cmrrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition re (124 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 95 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 184 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 168 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 147 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 365 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 73 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 179 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 159 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 138 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 93 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 211 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 230 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 136 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 70 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 370 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 406 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 157 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 80 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Intervene filed by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Poston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Monitronics International, Inc. re (370 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Intervene . Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 84 RETURN RECEIPT as to Craig Cunningham on #384 Order Terminate Hearings. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/8/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 83 RETURN RECEIPT as to Todd C. Bank on #384 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 10, 2015 Filing 85 Other Document Supplemental Statement of Plaintiff Newton Vaughan filed by Newton Vaughan. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK(Marshall, Jonathan). (DOCKET CORRECTION: This entry was filed in the lead case, 1:13MD2493 docket entry 387. The document states it relates to all cases, however, it was not spread to all cases. After contacting filer, the Clerk has now filed it in the cases to which it relates.) (kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 10, 2015 Filing 81 RETURN RECEIPT as to 381 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK (ALL CASES) Order, Delivered 4/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 10, 2015 Filing 80 RETURN RECEIPT as to #381 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK (ALL CASES) Order. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Bank on behalf of Todd C. Bank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Canceling Status Conference currently set for 4/6/15. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/3/15. (Copy PS Plaintiffs via cert. mail)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC HEARING re #380 Motion to Enforce the Court's Order for Discovery from ISI AlarmsNC, Inc. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs motion, the Court SCHEDULES same for a telephonic hearing for Tuesday, April 21, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to initiate the conference call and connect the Court at 1-304-623-7177. Defendant ISI Alarms NC, Inc is DIRECTED to file its response on or before Monday, April 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 4/2/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kac)(Copy to counsel (via CM/ECF), pro se plaintiffs (via cm/rrr)) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
April 1, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Court's Order for Discovery from ISI Alarms NC, Inc. by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 31, 2015 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Expert Disclosure. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 30, 2015 Filing 73 RETURN RECEIPT as to ( 367 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 69 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 69) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Todd C. Bank - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Disclosure of Call Records. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Windstream Communications, Inc. and Frontier Communications Corporation subpoenas)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 70 Pro Se MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs with Newly discovered Evidence under Fed. R. Civ. P Rule 24(A)2, Rule 24(B).. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting MOTION(S) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES in (403) 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK; (365) 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK; (227) 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK; (208) 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK; (181) e 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK; (176) 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK; (154) 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK; (362) 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK; (144) 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK; (165) 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK; (133) 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK; (121) 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK; (90) 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK; (135) 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK; (91) 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK; (154) 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK; (70) 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK; (77) 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK; (67) 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2015 and Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 7/31/15. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/23/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 23, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Disclosure by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 66 DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE, Per style of attached document, this entry is for 1:13md2493 and 1:14cv169 only. RESPONSE in Opposition re (339 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Dismiss, (138 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiff Craig Cunningham's Response in Opposition to 2GIG Technologies' Motion to Dismiss filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) Modified on 3/23/2015 (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monitronics International, Inc. Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 17, 2015 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Call Records. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 11, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 9, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roblin John Williamson Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Williamson, Roblin) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 6, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
March 5, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (339 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Dismiss, (138 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 27, 2015 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phillip J. Charvat, Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Response to UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Inc.'s Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 27, 2015 Filing 58 RETURN RECEIPT as to (46 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 325 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED by Todd Bank - date of delivery is blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK(jss) Modified on 2/27/2015 to remove duplicate docket text (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 26, 2015 Filing 57 RETURN RECEIPT as to (56 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 389 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 343 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 166 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 121 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 63 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 72 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 130 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 151 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 334 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 119 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 133 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 107 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 194 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 76 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 160 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK,) Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED by Craig Cunningham on 2/23/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) Modified on 2/27/2015 to remove duplicate docket text (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 26, 2015 Filing 56 RETURN RECEIPT as to (56 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 389 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 343 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 166 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 121 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 63 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 72 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 130 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 151 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 334 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 119 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 133 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 107 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 194 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 76 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 160 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK) Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED by Todd Bank - date of delivery blank. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) Modified on 2/27/2015 to remove duplicate docket text (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena and to Take Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert Kim on behalf of Monitronics International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Kim, Hubert) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena and to Take Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER/OPINION: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of ISI Documents onCompliance Point Privilege Logs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to refile in the Northern District of Georgia. ((369) Motion to Compel in case 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK; (294) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK; (193) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK; (174) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK; (146) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK; (140) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK; (120) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK; (318) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK; (110) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK; (131) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK; (99) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK; (87) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK; (56) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK; (101) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK; (51) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK; (103) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK; (36) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK; (43) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK; (28) Motion to Compel in case 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK) Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 2/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kac) (Copy to pro se plaintiffs (via cm/rrr)) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 50 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2015 re (193 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 174 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 318 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 28 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 87 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 294 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 146 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 120 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 56 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 369 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 110 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 101 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 43 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 99 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 36 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on Compliance Point Privilege Logs filed by Diana Mey. (Tape #cbg kaull monitronics international inc. 1 13 md 2493 02202015.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of FRCP 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 48 RETURN RECEIPT as to (40 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 315 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK) Order - no delivery date. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK(kac) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 19, 2015 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re (193 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 174 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 146 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 56 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 43 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 318 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 28 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 87 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 294 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 120 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 369 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 110 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 101 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 99 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 36 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs filed by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration Declaration of Beth E. Terrell, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of Beth E Terrell)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC HEARING: The Court SCHEDULES a telephonic hearingfor Friday, February 20, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. as to #294 Motion to Compel. (294 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 193 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 369 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 174 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 146 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 120 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 318 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 110 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 99 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 87 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 56 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 101 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 36 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 43 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 28 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs filed by Diana Mey, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (294 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 193 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 369 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 174 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 146 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 120 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 318 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 110 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 99 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 87 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 56 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 101 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 36 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 43 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 28 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs.( Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull.) (copies pro se plaintiffs certified mail) Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 2/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 17, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 17, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Monitronics International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 17, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' First Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Barrett, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 16, 2015 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Todd Bank by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: This entry was correctly filed in the master case 1:13MD2493 Docket entry 321, It is now also filed in the case to which it relates.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 13, 2015 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re (193 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 174 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 51 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 146 in 1:14-cv-00020-IMK-JSK, 56 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 43 in 1:14-cv-00185-IMK-JSK, 131 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 103 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 318 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 28 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 87 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 294 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 120 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 369 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 110 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 101 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 99 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 36 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs - RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 4, 2015 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY NON-PARTY COMPLIANCEPOINT, INC. filed by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 13, 2015 Filing 41 RETURN RECEIPT as to #305 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE which was set by Pre-trial Order #5, Docket entry #169 in 1:13md2493. The Court CANCELS the status conference currently scheduled for February 17, 2015. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(kd)(Copy pro se parties/cmrrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2015: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicholas Shreders, Bill Garcia, Kerry O'Shea, Edith Bowler, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, James G Hough Plaintiffs' Response to UTC Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Inc.'s Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 4, 2015 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Responses to Monitronics International, Inc.'s Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 4, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER : ORDERED that, within ten (10) days from entry of this Order,Defendants respond to this Order showing cause if any as to why they have failed to file a response, and showing cause if any as to why Plaintiffs motion to compel should not be granted for Defendants failure to file such response. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 2/4/15. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
February 3, 2015 Filing 34 RETURN RECEIPT as to #29 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/30/15. (jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 29, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 28, 2015 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keith Finklea, Scott Dolemba, Sandra Fairley, James Giles, Kerry O'Shea, Edith Bowler, Janet Hodgin, Michael Hodgin, James G Hough, Jason Bennett Plaintiffs' Responses to Monitronics International, Inc.'s Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE by Diana Mey Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 26, 2015 Filing 33 ANSWER, DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND OF MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO #1 CLASS-ACTION COMPLAINT by Monitronics International, Inc. (DOCKET CORRECTION: This entry was filed only in the lead case, 1:13MD2493 docket entry 298. It is now filed also in the case to which it relates)(kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF REFERRAL. The Court REFERS this action to the Honorable John S. Kaull, United States Magistrate Judge, who is hereby designated and authorized to consider the record and rule on the plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs ( #294 and any discoveryrequest or subsequent non-dispositive pre-trial motions filed in the case including, without limitation, conducting a hearing on the motions, if necessary, and entering into the record an order as to the appropriate disposition of the motion. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/26/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 16, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Production of ISI Documents on CompliancePoint Privilege Logs by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 7, 2015 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc. Privilege Log (January 7, 2015). Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Copland, Gordon) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court CANCELS the status conferencecurrently scheduled for January 8, 2015. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/7/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 5, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Security, Inc., Jasjit Gotra, Alliance Security Amended and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Teare, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
January 5, 2015 Filing 24 Other Document Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Statement filed by Phillip J. Charvat, Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 23 RETURN RECEIPT as to #17 Order, #15 Order, #21 Notice, #18 Order, #20 Order, #16 Order, #19 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/19/14. (njz) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles R. Pinkerton Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Pinkerton, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (Copy pro se filer/cmrrr) (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER #5: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed in MDL on 7/29/2014. (Document is incorrectly titled Pretrial Order #4) Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/29/2014. (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER #4: Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend filed in MDL on 6/13/2014. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/13/2014. (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER #3 filed in MDL on 6/9/14. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/9/2014. (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER APPLICABLE TO ALL CASES filed in MDL on 2/21/2014. Any prior Protective Orders entered in any matter other than 5:11-cv-90 are VACATED. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/21/2014. (kd) (Main Document 17 replaced on 12/15/2014) (kd). Modified on 12/15/2014 to attach correct document and Regenerate the NEF. (kd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER #2: Summary Order Following Initial Scheduling Conference filed in MDL on 2/11/2014. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/11/2014. (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #1: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed in MDL case 1:13-md-2493 on 1/15/2014. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2014. (kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:14-cv-04410. (kd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Case transferred to District of Northern District of West Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is transferred to the Northern District of West Virginia and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Irene M. Keeley for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings occurring there in this docket. (Attachments: #1 Transfer request) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 12 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is transferred to the Northern District of West Virginia and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Irene M. Keeley for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings occurring there in this docket. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER: The 10/20/14 Minute Entry was erroneously docketed under this case and should be disregarded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/20/2014. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
October 2, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Pro Se Plaintiff Todd C. Bank present. Defendants represented by Richard B. Harper, Esq. and Shannon E. Turner, Esq. Status Conference held on 10/2/2014. The parties disagree on the transferring of this case into the ongoing MDL case. In light of the ongoing MDL case, the Court has directed the parties to file whether jointly or separately, a status report via ECF by no later than 12/12/2014 as to how the MDL case is proceeding. This case is now stayed pending further order of this Court. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Lee, Ilene) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference on Thursday, October 2, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., to discuss the motions proposed in the defendant's letters #8 and #9 . Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/22/2014. (Levin, Sarah) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 11 Response of Alliance Security, Inc., in opposition to plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order No. 8. (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Gleeson and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon, Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/26/2014. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon:Conference held by telephone on 8/19/2014. In light of the pending conditional transfer order, the action is stayed until October 24, 2014. A status conference will be held on October 24, 2014 at 2:30 pm before Chief Judge Amon in Courtroom 10D South. If the action is transferred before October 24, 2014, counsel for defendant Monitronics International, Inc. shall notify the Court. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Cramer-Babycz, Laura) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: re #8 Letter filed by Monitronics International, Inc., #9 Letter filed by Monitronics International, Inc. A premotion conference will be held by telephone on August 19, 2014 at 2:30pm before Chief Judge Amon. Counsel for defendant Monitronics International, Inc. is directed to coordinate the call to chambers at 718-613-2410. So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/18/2014.(Cramer-Babycz, Laura) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Filing 9 Letter requesting pre-motion conference in regard to Motion to Stay by Monitronics International, Inc. (Harper, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Filing 8 Letter requesting pre-motion conference in regard to Motion to Dismiss by Monitronics International, Inc. (Harper, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Monitronics International, Inc.. (Harper, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Benjamin Harper on behalf of Monitronics International, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Harper, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
August 4, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Schedule of Potential Tag-Along Action) (Fernandez, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 29, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Versatile Marketing Solutions, Inc.. (Sica, Michele) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alliance Security Inc., Monitronics International, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 23, 2014 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653076730 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Todd C. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/15/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank v. Alliance Security Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versatile Marketing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Security Inc.
Represented By: John R. Teare, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monitronics International, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Carlson
Represented By: Richard Benjamin Harper
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Holmstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc
Represented By: Becca J. Wahlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd C. Bank
Represented By: Todd C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dolemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Catherine Smith
Represented By: John W. Davis
Represented By: Salene Rae Mazur Kraemer
Represented By: Courtland Wayne Creekmore
Represented By: Charles Benjamin Nutley
Represented By: C. Benjamin Nutley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: LaVincent Nealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?