HDI Global Insurance Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03987
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: James River Insurance Company answer due 9/18/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/5/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by James River Insurance Company. (Clark, Paul)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Service and ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hsiung, Mara)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 9/3/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/1/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Park, Jung)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hsiung, Mara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hsiung, Mara)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Insurance Company. James River Insurance Company served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Heineman, Geoffrey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Insurance Company. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Heineman, Geoffrey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James River Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG, Other Affiliate HDI Global Network AG, Other Affiliate HDI Global SE for HDI Global Insurance Company. (Heineman, Geoffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James River Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11649381 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Compliant, #6 Exhibit D to Complaint, #7 Exhibit E to Complaint, #8 F to Complaint) (Heineman, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Insurance Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Mara Hsiung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul F. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Geoffrey William Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?