Craine v. Stylish Curves LLC
Plaintiff: Nicole Craine
Defendant: Stylish Curves LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03995
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #10 Letter. The request to vacate sanction denied. Plaintiff's counsel was required to take the action ordered by this Court no later than 8/21/2019. Whatever his interactions with non-appearing defense counsel, he made no effort to even contact this Court until 8/30/2019, let alone comply with its Order. Court Orders may not be ignored. The $100 sanction remains pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) stands and must be paid forthwith with proof of payment filed on the docket.In addition, the Court resets the Initial Status Conference for 9/11/2019 at 12:30 pm in Courtroom 8D South and the parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #6 . Mr. Liebowitz is directed to attend this conference personally, not send some other lawyer.Finally, in any future filings with the Court, counsel must include in the ECF subject line a brief description of the subject of any filing, in this case, "Letter requesting that sanction imposed by the Court be vacated", not simply "Letter", so that the docket remains intelligible. Furthermore, this letter should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion" since it seeks relief from the Court. Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/3/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO ANSWER is extended nunc pro tunc to 9/4/2019. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/30/19 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Letter by Nicole Craine (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by Nicole Craine (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER. Plaintiff has failed to either request entry of default from the Clerk by close of business 8/21/2019 or show up for the Initial Status Conference scheduled for 8/21/2019. Plaintiff was required to do one or the other by the Court's 8/20/2019 Order. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f), plaintiff's counsel is sanctioned in the amount of $100, payable to the Clerk of Court within 7 days, with proof of payment filed on the docket of this action. Plaintiff is further advised that if he does not request entry of default from the Clerk within that same 7 days, this action will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference on condition that plaintiff requests entry of default from the Clerk by close of business 8/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Craine. Stylish Curves LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #7 . The Court will not rule on this motion unless plaintiff files proof of service of the summons and complaint as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l)(1) or advises the Court that service has not yet been made. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nicole Craine. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 8/21/2019 at 5:15 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/12/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stylish Curves LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stylish Curves LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11650344 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Nicole Craine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craine v. Stylish Curves LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Craine
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stylish Curves LLC
Represented By: Stephen L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?