Prokos v. Lions Equities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Prokos
Defendant: Does 1-10, Lions Equities, LLC and Jonathan Lemze
Case Number: 1:2019cv04028
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION re Order to Show Cause,, #13 Order Dismissing Case by Andrew Prokos (Steger, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE dated 9/9/19. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2019 )*Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff failed to appear at the Initial Status Conference scheduled by the Court for today, failed to comply with this Court's mandatory requirements, and failed to submit any request to adjourn the conference. Therefore, plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 9/4/2019 as to why monetary or other sanctions, including dismissal, should not be imposed on him for failure to comply with this Court's scheduling order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/28/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Lions Equities, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Andrew Prokos (Steger, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/16/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Lemze, Lions Equities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Andrew Prokos (Steger, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Andrew Prokos (Steger, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Andrew Prokos Notice of Copyright Action (Form AO121) (Steger, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Andrew Prokos (Steger, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Jonathan Lemze, Lions Equities, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11658111 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Andrew Prokos. (Steger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prokos v. Lions Equities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lions Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lemze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Prokos
Represented By: Michael Douglas Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?