Community Housing Improvement Program et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Community Housing Improvement Program, Mycak Associates LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Cindy Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC and M&G Mycak LLC
Defendant: J. Scott Walsh, City of New York, RuthAnne Visnauskas, Leah Goodridge, German Tejeda, Alex Schwarz, Cecilia Joza, Sheila Garcia, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, May Yu and Patti Stone
Petitioner: Komatsu Towaki, Community Voices Heard (CVH) and N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Case Number: 1:2019cv04087
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion for Hearing. The Court denies the #31 Motion for Hearing. The Court directs proposed intervenors to file their motion(s) to intervene on or before October 1, 2019. Any opposition to the motion(s) shall be filed on or before October 15, 2019, and any reply shall be filed on or before October 29, 2019. Should the parties and proposed intervenors agree on a different motion schedule, they may submit a proposed amended schedule to the Court for approval. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/12/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 Letter MOTION for Hearing regarding proposed motion to intervenee by N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N), Community Voices Heard (CVH). (Piper, Francine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Intervene by Komatsu Towaki. (Piper, Francine)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #27 First MOTION for pre motion conference, #29 MOTION for pre motion conference. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' letters on or before September 16, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/9/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for pre motion conference on Commissioner Visnauskas's anticipated Rule 12(b) motion to dismiss by RuthAnne Visnauskas. (Conley, Jonathan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Conley on behalf of RuthAnne Visnauskas (aty to be noticed) (Conley, Jonathan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for pre motion conference regarding City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh, May Yu. (Moston, Rachel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Alex Schwarz served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Cecilia Joza served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Sheila Garcia served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Patti Stone served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. May Yu served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. German Tejeda served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. J. Scott Walsh served on 8/7/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Bishop on behalf of Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Bishop, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pincus on behalf of Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Pincus, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, RuthAnne Visnauskas, J. Scott Walsh, May Yu answer due 9/6/2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/7/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh, May Yu. (Moston, Rachel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Kane Moston on behalf of City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh, May Yu (aty to be noticed) (Moston, Rachel)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/5/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11730296. by Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bishop, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/24/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy recused. Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/22/2019. (Marziliano, August)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11666708. AFFIDAVIT OF ANDREW J. PINCUS filed by Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC. (Pincus, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Leah Goodridge served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion fails to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(a), which requires an affidavit from the applicant. The Court directs the applicant to submit an affidavit compliant with the requirements of Rule 1.3(a). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/23/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. RuthAnne Visnauskas served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. David Reiss served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. Rent Guidelines Board served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. City of New York served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hamburg, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11666708. by Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Pincus, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Hamburg on behalf of Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hamburg, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Vermyck LLC (Goeke, Reginald)
July 16, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, RuthAnne Visnauskas, J. Scott Walsh, May Yu filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11665023 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Cindy Realty LLC, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Community Housing Improvement Program, M&G Mycak LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Declaration of Jason Martin, #4 Declaration of Joseph Strasburg) (Goeke, Reginald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Housing Improvement Program et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Scott Walsh
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas
Represented By: Jonathan Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Goodridge
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Tejeda
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Schwarz
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Joza
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reiss
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent Guidelines Board
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Yu
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Stone
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Housing Improvement Program
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mycak Associates LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Realty LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Nugent-Miller
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Realty LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Realty, LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc.
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermyck LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&G Mycak LLC
Represented By: Reginald Goeke
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Komatsu Towaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Voices Heard (CVH)
Represented By: Judith A. Goldiner
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Edward J Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Represented By: Judith A. Goldiner
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Edward J Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?