Herrera v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Julio Herrera
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04088
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the initial conference previously scheduled for September 27, 2019 is adjourned to October 3, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/13/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference previously scheduled for September 18, 2019 is adjourned to September 27, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/30/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The Long Island Railroad Company. (McGrath, J.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:30 p.m. on September 18, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (McGrath, J.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels for The Long Island Railroad Company. (McGrath, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11665322 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Julio Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Herrera
Represented By: Philip Patrick Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: J. Dennis McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?