Carchi v. Michael et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Carchi
Defendant: Jay P Michael and Pottles Transporation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04103
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 9/4/2019. Attorney Alexander Roytblat appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney Jennifer Rebecca Harris appeared on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's counsel indicated that plaintiff has undergone arthroscopic surgery in his right knee surgery and may require further surgery. He is also receiving physical therapy. The parties indicated that defendant's tractor trailer truck had a dashboard camera which recorded the incident and the video has been produced to plaintiff. Plaintiff's counsel indicated that the video only covers a short time frame and requested video for a longer time; the Court directed counsel to confer with each other about discovery requests and only seek Court intervention for matters that cannot be resolved. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. The parties were directed to move expeditiously with discovery, especially in light of the paucity of documents and that there are only two fact witnesses to be deposed. The parties were also directed to file a joint status report by October 8, 2019 reporting on the progress of discovery and raising any issues which need to be addressed. They should also indicate whether they want a referral to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation. If they want a settlement conference with this Court instead, they should propose mutually convenient dates. (FTR Log #10:48-11:23.) (Riquelme, Claudia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed discovery plan by Joshua Carchi (Roytblat, Alexander)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on September 4, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/1/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Harris, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Jay P Michael, Pottles Transporation, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from QUEENS, case number 708790/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11667342) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF POTTLES TRANSPORTATION, LLC OF COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit CIVIL COVER SHEET) (Harris, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carchi v. Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay P Michael
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottles Transporation, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Carchi
Represented By: Alexander Roytblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?