Klein v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lazer Klein
Defendant: Discover Bank, Trans Union, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Bank Of America, N.A. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04113
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting [22-1] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED). See the attached order. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/6/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED) by Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Fiano, Talia)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
August 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
August 17, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
August 17, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank Of America, N.A. answer due 9/19/2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lazer Klein. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lazer Klein. Trans Union, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lazer Klein. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 9/5/2019 Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/5/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fiano, Talia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discover Bank (Fiano, Talia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lazer Klein. U.S. Bank National Association served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ginzburg on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (aty to be noticed) (Ginzburg, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Ginzburg, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A., Discover Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11668558 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Lazer Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Talia Nella Fiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Daniel Ginzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazer Klein
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?