Committee for the Advancement of Torah v. Castella Imports, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Committee for the Advancement of Torah d/b/a OK Kosher Certification and Committee for the Advancement of Torah
Defendant: Castella Imports, Inc. and Nektar Karagianes
Case Number: 1:2019cv04133
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. (Sacks, Ira)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. Castella Imports, Inc. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Sacks, Ira)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #14 . Defendants' time to answer is extended to 10/7/2019; Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 9/26/2019 at 11:30 am in Chambers 704S. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #7 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Adjourn Conference , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Castella Imports, Inc., Nektar Karagianes. (Tricolla, Danielle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle E Tricolla on behalf of Castella Imports, Inc., Nektar Karagianes (aty to be noticed) (Tricolla, Danielle)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #12 . First, this letter should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion" since it seeks relief from the Court, do not refile the letter. In any event, the request to adjourn is DENIED. The Court does not adjourn or extend matters at the behest of a plaintiff's counsel when there has been no appearance by defendants. By the scheduled time of this Initial Status Conference, defendants will either have appeared by counsel, or they will be in default. Plaintiff is ORDERED to request entry of default from the Clerk of the Court no more than five days after defendants go into default, failing which this action will be dismissed. Upon the filing of that request, the Initial Status Conference will be deemed adjourned without further Order. If defendants timely appear, they can request their own adjournment, although (1) the Court does not generally adjourn or extend matters in contemplation of settlement discussions, as the parties are free to settle at any time; and (2) by the time of the scheduled Initial Status Conference, any counsel for defendants retained as of the date of plaintiff's motion should have had ample time to investigate the case, as the complaint portrays this as a simple case of trademark misappropriation. If there's more to it, defendants can explain it (if they do not default) as part of their request for an adjournment, but the parties are advised that discovery and trial in this case will be on a prompt schedule if the parties do not settle before the Initial Status Conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/19/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Letter requesting Adjournment of September 4, 2019 Initial Status Conference by Committee for the Advancement of Torah (Sacks, Ira)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. (Sacks, Ira)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. (Sacks, Ira)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. Castella Imports, Inc. served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Sacks, Ira)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah. Nektar Karagianes served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Sacks, Ira)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/18/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Hong, Loan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Nektar summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Committee for the Advancement of Torah d/b/a OK Kosher Certification - From AO 120, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Sacks, Ira)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Castella Imports, Inc., Nektar Karagianes filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11672708 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Committee for the Advancement of Torah d/b/a OK Kosher Certification. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Castella Imports, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Nektar Karagianes) (Sacks, Ira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Committee for the Advancement of Torah v. Castella Imports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee for the Advancement of Torah d/b/a OK Kosher Certification
Represented By: Ira S. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee for the Advancement of Torah
Represented By: Ira S. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castella Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle E Tricolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nektar Karagianes
Represented By: Danielle E Tricolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?