Arenas v. The Lightstone Group, LLC
Plaintiff: MAURICIO ARENAS
Defendant: THE LIGHTSTONE GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04135
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby noted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/11/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/11/2019. Counsel for both sides present. Defendant shall implead any additional parties by 9/25/2019. Fact discovery shall end on 1/17/2020. Case Management Plan to be docketed separately. (Clarke, Melonie)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #12 Letter. In any future filings with the Court, counsel must include in the ECF subject line a brief description of the subject of any filing, in this case, "Joint summary letter for initial conference", not simply "Letter", so that the docket remains intelligible. Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Letter by Mauricio Arenas (Melekou, Eleni)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleni Melekou on behalf of Mauricio Arenas (aty to be noticed) (Melekou, Eleni)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Status Conference previously set for 9/4/2019 is reset to 9/11/2019 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Lightstone Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata Stipulation extending time to answer) (Rubin, Solomon)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mauricio Arenas. The Lightstone Group, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Pardalis, Anastasi)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/18/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Hong, Loan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Lightstone Group, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by MAURICIO ARENAS (Pardalis, Anastasi)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by MAURICIO ARENAS (Pardalis, Anastasi)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MAURICIO ARENAS against THE LIGHTSTONE GROUP, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11673040 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by MAURICIO ARENAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Pardalis, Anastasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arenas v. The Lightstone Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LIGHTSTONE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Solomon Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICIO ARENAS
Represented By: Anastasi Pardalis
Represented By: Eleni Melekou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?