Stahl v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Aviva Stahl
Defendant: Department of Justice and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2019cv04142
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dated 9/12/19 granting Law Student Intern Appearance Form re #10 Notice(Other) filed by Aviva Stahl. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/12/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Aviva Stahl Letter enclosing Law Student Appearance Forms for Court's Signature (Attachments: #1 Law Student Intern Appearance Forms) (Ginsberg, Betsy)
September 9, 2019 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2019. Counsel for both sides present. By 9/16/2019, the parties shall file a proposed scheduling order for this case. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Joint Letter in Connection with Status Conference by Aviva Stahl (Ginsberg, Betsy)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 defendants' motion for an extension of time to file their answer until 9/19/2019. The Initial Status Conference will proceed as previously scheduled for 9/9/2019 at 10:45 am in Chambers 704S. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/4/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, respectfully seeking, with the consent of the plaintiff, a two week extension from 9/5/19 to 9/19/19 to answer the complaint. Respectfully submitted by Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Amanat, Farzin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Farzin Franklin Amanat on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Amanat, Farzin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aviva Stahl. Department of Justice served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Ginsberg, Betsy)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 9/9/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/29/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11673641 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aviva Stahl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Ginsberg, Betsy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stahl v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Stahl
Represented By: Betsy R. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?